Martin v. Evoqua Water Technologies, LLC
Plaintiff: Lawrence Martin
Defendant: Evoqua Water Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00585
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Evoqua Water Technologies, LLC (Vincent, William)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 9/26/2019 at 11:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 9/19/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by Evoqua Water Technologies, LLC (Vincent, William)
August 28, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of William J. Vincent on behalf of defendant Evoqua Water Technologies, LLC (Vincent, William)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting stipulated proposed order #5 ; Defendant shall have through and including 8/28/2019 to respond to Plaintiff's complaint; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Answer Extension by defendant Evoqua Water Technologies, LLC (Vincent, William)
July 29, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of William J. Vincent on behalf of defendant Evoqua Water Technologies, LLC (Vincent, William)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Evoqua Water Technologies, LLC (ems)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ems)
July 19, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Lawrence Martin in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4487823 (Glazier, Bradley)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Glazier, Bradley)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Evoqua Water Technologies, LLC filed by Lawrence Martin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Glazier, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Evoqua Water Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evoqua Water Technologies, LLC
Represented By: William J. Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Martin
Represented By: Bradley K. Glazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?