Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 108.89.90.2
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 108.89.90.2
Case Number: 1:2019cv00616
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Copy of complaint #1 , Voluntary Dismissal of Case #8 , Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Copyright Office (ems)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Register of Copyrights on the determination of a COPYRIGHT ACTION (ems)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Bernier, Joel)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 motion for leave to file; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
July 31, 2019 Copy of complaint #1 , Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Copyright Office (ems)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Register of Copyrights on the filing of a COPYRIGHT ACTION (ems)
July 31, 2019 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (none provided) (ems)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (ems)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Bernier, Joel)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion for Leave to File #2 filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Susan Stalzer, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Greg Lansky, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Tobias Fieser) (Bernier, Joel)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to file by plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bernier, Joel)
July 30, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4495049 (Bernier, Joel)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 108.89.90.2 filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (Bernier, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 108.89.90.2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Joel Alexander Bernier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 108.89.90.2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?