Larsen, Jr. v. Menard, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bruce Larsen, Jr.
Defendant: Menard, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00619
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Herman, Thomas)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 10/7/2019 at 10:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 9/30/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to complaint with affirmative defenses and Reliance Upon Jury Demand by Menard, Inc. (Herman, Thomas)
August 1, 2019 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case #4 , Attorney Admission Letter #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Meredith Curless (mg)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Meredith Curless; attorney admission deadline set for 8/29/2019; (mg)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (mg)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Financial Interest by Menard, Inc. (Herman, Thomas)
July 30, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Menard, Inc. in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4495379 (Herman, Thomas)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING notice of removal re #1 directed to Kent County Circuit Court by defendant Menard, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Filing) (Herman, Thomas)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Cause from Kent County Circuit Court case number 19-05512-NO filed by Menard, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B State Court Proof of Service) (Herman, Thomas) Modified text on 8/1/2019 (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larsen, Jr. v. Menard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas G. Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Larsen, Jr.
Represented By: Meredith Paige Curless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?