Otworth v. Moulatsiotis et al
Plaintiff: Clarence Otworth
Defendant: Samantha Reasner, Dana Nessel, Cheryl Moss, Lisa Swanson, Jessica Kidder, Dalton, Township of, Gretchen Whitmer, Tammy Stephenson, Tony Moulatsiotis, Lakewood Club, Village of and Muskegon, County of
Case Number: 1:2019cv00621
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
2 Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 71 REPLY to response to motion #37 , #46 , #48 , #47 (with Certificate of Service) filed by Clarence Otworth (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F) (ems)
September 26, 2019 Copy of Order #69 sent via U.S. Mail to Clarence Otworth (ems)
September 26, 2019 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Clarence Otworth for letter to attorney Allan C. Vander Laan (includes copy of letter) (ems) Modified text on 9/26/2019 (ems).
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Regarding Rule 16 Scheduling Conference; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
September 25, 2019 Copy of Order #67 sent via U.S. Mail to Clarence Otworth (ems)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER re correspondence from Plaintiff Otworth dated 9/16/2019 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
September 23, 2019 Filing 66 RESPONSE TO MOTION to quash Plaintiff's Requests for Admission and for Protective Order Staying Discovery #56 (with Certificate of Service) filed by Clarence Otworth (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems)
September 19, 2019 Filing 65 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for MOTION for sanctions #63 filed by Cheryl Moss, Tony Moulatsiotis, Muskegon, County of (Vander Laan, Allan)
September 19, 2019 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for sanctions #63 (Certificate of Concurrence) filed by Cheryl Moss, Tony Moulatsiotis, Muskegon, County of (Vander Laan, Allan) Modified text on 9/20/2019 (ems).
September 19, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION for sanctions (with Certificate of Service) by defendants Cheryl Moss, Tony Moulatsiotis, Muskegon, County of; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Vander Laan, Allan) Modified text on 9/20/2019 (ems).
September 19, 2019 Filing 62 OBJECTION to Plaintiff's Requests for Admissions (with Certificate of Service) by defendants Dana Nessel, Samantha Reasner, Gretchen Whitmer (Ragatzki, Kyla) Modified text on 9/20/2019 (ems).
September 18, 2019 Filing 68 LETTER from Clarence Matthew Otworth (filed per Order #67 ) (ns)
September 17, 2019 Filing 61 REPLY to response to motion #19 (with Certificate of Service) filed by Cheryl Moss, Tony Moulatsiotis, Muskegon, County of (Vander Laan, Allan) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (ems).
September 16, 2019 Filing 60 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for summary judgment against defendant Tony Moulatsiotis (with Certificate of Service) #37 , MOTION for summary judgment against defendant Cheryl Moss (with Certificate of Service) #46 , MOTION for summary judgment against defendant Muskegon, County of (with Certificate of Service) #48 , MOTION for summary judgment against defendant Tony Moulatsiotis (with Certificate of Service) #47 (includes Certificate of Service) filed by Cheryl Moss, Tony Moulatsiotis, Muskegon, County of (Vander Laan, Allan) Modified text on 9/17/2019 (ems).
September 12, 2019 Filing 59 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Lakewood Club, Village of, Lisa Swanson re Brief in Support of a Motion, #57 , Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence #58 , MOTION to quash Plaintiff's Requests for Admission and for Protective Order Staying Discovery #56 (Meyer, Brett)
September 12, 2019 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to quash Plaintiff's Requests for Admission and for Protective Order Staying Discovery #56 filed by Lakewood Club, Village of, Lisa Swanson (Meyer, Brett)
September 12, 2019 Filing 57 BRIEF in support of MOTION to quash Plaintiff's Requests for Admission and for Protective Order Staying Discovery #56 filed by Lakewood Club, Village of, Lisa Swanson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Meyer, Brett)
September 12, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION to quash Plaintiff's Requests for Admission and for Protective Order Staying Discovery by defendants Lakewood Club, Village of, Lisa Swanson; (Meyer, Brett)
September 12, 2019 Filing 55 OBJECTION to Plaintiff's Requests for Admissions by defendants Cheryl Moss, Tony Moulatsiotis, Muskegon, County of (Attachments: #1 Attachment Brief in Support and Certificate of Service) (Vander Laan, Allan)
September 11, 2019 Filing 54 SUPPLEMENT re MOTION for recusal (as taken from #53 ), Response to Motion #53 (includes previous missing pages) (with Certificate of Service) by plaintiff Clarence Otworth (ems) Modified text on 9/11/2019 (ems).
September 9, 2019 MOTION for recusal (as taken from #53 ) by plaintiff Clarence Otworth; (ems)
September 9, 2019 Filing 53 RESPONSE TO MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim (Defendants Village of Lakewood Club and Lisa Swanson's Motion to Dismiss) #33 (with Certificate of Service) filed by Clarence Otworth (ems)
September 6, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION for summary judgment against defendant Lakewood Club, Village of (with Certificate of Service) by plaintiff Clarence Otworth; (ems) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2019: #1 Exhibits A-Q) (ems).
September 6, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for summary judgment against defendant Tammy Stephenson (with Certificate of Service) by plaintiff Clarence Otworth; (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-Q) (ems)
September 6, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION for summary judgment against defendant Lisa Swanson (with Certificate of Service) by plaintiff Clarence Otworth; (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-Q) (ems)
September 6, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for summary judgment against defendant Samantha Reasner (with Certificate of Service) by plaintiff Clarence Otworth; (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-Q) (ems)
September 6, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for summary judgment against defendant Muskegon, County of (with Certificate of Service) by plaintiff Clarence Otworth; (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-Q) (ems)
September 6, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for summary judgment against defendant Tony Moulatsiotis (with Certificate of Service) by plaintiff Clarence Otworth; (ems) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2019: #1 Exhibits A-Q) (ems).
September 6, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for summary judgment against defendant Cheryl Moss (with Certificate of Service) by plaintiff Clarence Otworth; (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-Q) (ems)
September 6, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for summary judgment against defendant Jessica Kidder (with Certificate of Service) by plaintiff Clarence Otworth; (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-Q) (ems)
September 6, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for summary judgment against defendant Gretchen Whitmer (with Certificate of Service) by plaintiff Clarence Otworth; (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-Q) (ems)
September 6, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION for summary judgment against defendant Dalton, Township of (with Certificate of Service) by plaintiff Clarence Otworth; (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-Q) (ems) Modified text on 9/9/2019 (ems).
September 6, 2019 Filing 42 RESPONSE TO MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim (Defendants Village of Lakewood Club and Lisa Swanson's Motion to Dismiss) #33 (with Certificate of Service) filed by Clarence Otworth (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems)
September 6, 2019 Filing 41 RESPONSE TO MOTION to amend/correct Motion to Dismiss or Stay #30 , MOTION to dismiss or Stay #24 (with Certificate of Service) filed by Clarence Otworth (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems)
September 5, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE TO MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #19 (with Certificate of Service) filed by Clarence Otworth (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems)
September 5, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for summary judgment against defendant defendant Dana Nessel (with Certificate of Service) by plaintiff Clarence Otworth; (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-Q) (ems)
September 5, 2019 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Dana Nessel, Samantha Reasner, Gretchen Whitmer for Non-Document Attorney Appearance of Kyla Lillian Ragatzki on behalf of Defendants Nessel, Reasner and Whitmer (Ragatzki, Kyla)
September 3, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for summary judgment against defendant Tony Moulatsiotis (with Certificate of Service) by plaintiff Clarence Otworth; (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-O) (ems)
September 3, 2019 Filing 36 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Lakewood Club, Village of, Lisa Swanson re MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim (Defendants Village of Lakewood Club and Lisa Swanson's Motion to Dismiss) #33 , Brief in Support of a Motion #34 , Certificate of Compliance Regarding Word Count #35 (Meyer, Brett)
September 3, 2019 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion #34 filed by Lakewood Club, Village of, Lisa Swanson (Meyer, Brett)
September 3, 2019 Filing 34 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim (Defendants Village of Lakewood Club and Lisa Swanson's Motion to Dismiss) #33 filed by Lakewood Club, Village of, Lisa Swanson (Meyer, Brett)
September 3, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim (Defendants Village of Lakewood Club and Lisa Swanson's Motion to Dismiss) by defendants Lakewood Club, Village of, Lisa Swanson; (Meyer, Brett)
August 30, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE to attorney Jessica Audra McGivney regarding recent filing #29 (ems)
August 30, 2019 Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Dalton, Township of, Jessica Kidder, Cheryl Moss, Tammy Stephenson re AMENDED MOTION to dismiss or Stay #30 (Leisman, Ross) Modified text on 8/30/2019 (ems).
August 30, 2019 Filing 30 AMENDED MOTION to dismiss or Stay by defendants Dalton, Township of, Jessica Kidder, Cheryl Moss, Tammy Stephenson; (Leisman, Ross) Modified text on 8/30/2019; this entry replaces #24 (ems).
August 30, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Ross A. Leisman on behalf of defendant Cheryl Moss (Leisman, Ross)
August 30, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint in Lieu of an Answer (with Certificate of Service) by defendants Dana Nessel, Samantha Reasner, Gretchen Whitmer; (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support) (McGivney, Jessica) Modified text on 8/30/2019 (ems).
August 30, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jessica Audra McGivney on behalf of defendants Dana Nessel, Samantha Reasner, Gretchen Whitmer (McGivney, Jessica)
August 30, 2019 Filing 28 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendants Dalton, Township of, Jessica Kidder, Tammy Stephenson re MOTION to dismiss or Stay #24 , OBJECTION to Plaintiff's Request for Additional Admissions by defendants Dalton, Township of, Jessica Kidder, Tammy Stephenson #26 , Brief in Support of a Motion, #25 , Attorney Appearance, Certificate of Compliance Regarding Word Count #27 (Leisman, Ross)
August 30, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion, #25 filed by Dalton, Township of, Jessica Kidder, Tammy Stephenson (Leisman, Ross)
August 30, 2019 Filing 26 OBJECTION to Plaintiff's Request for Additional Admissions by defendants Dalton, Township of, Jessica Kidder, Tammy Stephenson (Leisman, Ross)
August 30, 2019 Filing 25 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss or Stay #24 and in Support of Their Objection to Plaintiff's Request for Additional Admissions filed by Dalton, Township of, Jessica Kidder, Tammy Stephenson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Leisman, Ross)
August 30, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to dismiss or Stay by defendants Dalton, Township of, Jessica Kidder, Tammy Stephenson; (Leisman, Ross)
August 29, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Ross A. Leisman on behalf of defendants Dalton, Township of, Jessica Kidder, Tammy Stephenson (Leisman, Ross)
August 29, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Bradley Charles Yanalunas on behalf of defendants Cheryl Moss, Tony Moulatsiotis, Muskegon, County of (Yanalunas, Bradley)
August 28, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #19 filed by Cheryl Moss, Tony Moulatsiotis, Muskegon, County of (Vander Laan, Allan) Modified text on 8/29/2019 (ems).
August 28, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Cheryl Moss, Tony Moulatsiotis, Muskegon, County of re CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #19 , #23 (Vander Laan, Allan) Modified text and link on 8/29/2019, per ECF Help Desk call (jlg)
August 28, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Cheryl Moss, Tony Moulatsiotis, Muskegon, County of re MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #19 , CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #20 (Vander Laan, Allan) Modified text on 8/29/2019 (ems).
August 28, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #19 filed by Cheryl Moss, Tony Moulatsiotis, Muskegon, County of (Vander Laan, Allan)
August 28, 2019 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, #18 sent via U.S. Mail to Clarence Otworth (ems)
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendants Cheryl Moss, Tony Moulatsiotis, Muskegon, County of; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Brief in Support) (Vander Laan, Allan)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ray Kent for handling of all matters under 636(a) and 636(b)(1)(A) and for submission of recommendations on dispositive motions under 636(b)(1)(B); signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
August 27, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Brett Thomas Meyer on behalf of defendants Lakewood Club, Village of, Lisa Swanson (Meyer, Brett)
August 26, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS returned executed; Muskegon, County of served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019 (as verified on USPS website per tracking number) (ems) Modified text on 8/26/2019 (ems).
August 22, 2019 Copy of Administrative Order Reassigning Case #16 sent via U.S. Mail to Clarence Otworth (ns)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER No. 19-CA-070 that referrals in this case are reassigned to Magistrate Judge Ray Kent for all further proceedings; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (ns)
August 21, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kyla Lillian Ragatzki on behalf of defendants Dana Nessel, Samantha Reasner, Gretchen Whitmer (Ragatzki, Kyla)
August 16, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Muskegon, County of and returned to plaintiff via mail (ems) Modified text on 8/16/2019 (ems).
August 16, 2019 Filing 15 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with jury demand (with Certificate of Service) against Dalton, Township of, Jessica Kidder, Lakewood Club, Village of, Cheryl Moss, Tony Moulatsiotis, Muskegon, County of, Dana Nessel, Samantha Reasner, Tammy Stephenson, Lisa Swanson, Gretchen Whitmer filed by Clarence Otworth (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Proposed Summons) (ems)
August 14, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kyla Lillian Ragatzki on behalf of defendant Samantha Reasner (Ragatzki, Kyla)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed; Lakewood Club, Village of served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/2/2019 (as verified on USPS website per tracking number) (ems) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (ems).
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed; Dalton, Township of served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019 (as verified on USPS website per tracking number) (ems) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (ems).
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed; Tony Moulatsiotis served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019 (as verified on USPS website per tracking number) (ems) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (ems).
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed; Tammy Stephenson served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019 (as verified on USPS website per tracking number) (ems) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (ems).
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed; Samantha Reasner served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019 (as verified on USPS website per tracking number) (ems) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (ems).
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed; Lisa Swanson served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/2/2019 (as verified on USPS website per tracking number) (ems) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (ems).
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed; Jessica Kidder served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019 (as verified on USPS website per tracking number) (ems) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (ems).
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed; Gretchen Whitmer served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019 (as verified on USPS website per tracking number) (ems) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (ems).
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; Dana Nessel served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019 (as verified on USPS website per tracking number) (ems) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (ems).
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Cheryl Moss served on 8/9/2019, answer due 8/30/2019 (as verified on USPS website per tracking number) (ems) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (ems).
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 SIGNATURE PAGE submitted by plaintiff Clarence Otworth for complaint, #1 (ems)
August 2, 2019 Copy of Conditional Order Striking Pleading or Other Paper #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Clarence Otworth (ems)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CONDITIONAL ORDER striking complaint #1 unless the filing party submits a signature page within 21 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw)
August 1, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Dalton, Township of, Jessica Kidder, Lakewood Club, Village of, Cheryl Moss, Tony Moulatsiotis, Dana Nessel, Samantha Reasner, Tammy Stephenson, Lisa Swanson, Gretchen Whitmer and returned to plaintiff via mail (ems) Modified text on 8/1/2019 (ems).
August 1, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Clarence Otworth (ems)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of receipt of case (ems)
July 31, 2019 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00, receipt number GR067096; for civil filing fee (ems)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Dalton, Township of, Jessica Kidder, Lakewood Club, Village of, Cheryl Moss, Tony Moulatsiotis, Dana Nessel, Samantha Reasner, Tammy Stephenson, Lisa Swanson, Gretchen Whitmer filed by Clarence Otworth (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Otworth v. Moulatsiotis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Reasner
Represented By: Kyla Lillian Ragatzki
Represented By: Jessica Audra McGivney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Nessel
Represented By: Kyla Lillian Ragatzki
Represented By: Jessica Audra McGivney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Moss
Represented By: Bradley Charles Yanalunas
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Represented By: Ross A. Leisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Swanson
Represented By: Brett Thomas Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Kidder
Represented By: Ross A. Leisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dalton, Township of
Represented By: Ross A. Leisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer
Represented By: Kyla Lillian Ragatzki
Represented By: Jessica Audra McGivney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Stephenson
Represented By: Ross A. Leisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Moulatsiotis
Represented By: Bradley Charles Yanalunas
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakewood Club, Village of
Represented By: Brett Thomas Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muskegon, County of
Represented By: Bradley Charles Yanalunas
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Otworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?