Kaufman v. Michigan State University et al
Plaintiff: Erin Kaufman and Dr. Erin Kaufman
Defendant: Lawrence Gerard Nassar, The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Michigan State University and Michigan State University Board of Trustees
Case Number: 1:2019cv00629
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Gordon J Quist
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting STIPULATION #16 extending time to file; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
September 18, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Adjourn Deadline to Respond to Complaint by defendants Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Eldridge, Scott)
September 17, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Laura Bernescu on behalf of defendants Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Bernescu, Laura)
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #14 (Little, Jonathan)
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Erin Kaufman (Little, Jonathan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed; Lawrence Gerard Nassar served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019 (Little, Jonathan)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re JOINT MOTION to dismiss the Operative Complaints in Consolidated and Related Actions (Omnibus) #9 filed by Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Van Gelder, Amy)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 MSU Defendants' EXHIBIT re #10 5, Parts 1-5 to the Memorandum in Support of Joint Omnibus Motion to Dismiss the Operative Complaints in Consolidated and Related Actions by defendants Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 - Notices Filed By Plaintiffs in the Court of Claims Part 2, #2 Exhibit 5 - Notices Filed By Plaintiffs in the Court of Claims Part 3, #3 Exhibit 5 - Notices Filed By Plaintiffs in the Court of Claims Part 4, #4 Exhibit 5 - Notices Filed By Plaintiffs in the Court of Claims Part 5) (Van Gelder, Amy)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion to Dismiss #9 (Omnibus) filed by Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pending Cases Against the MSU Defendants, #2 Exhibit 2 - Claims Asserted Against the MSU Defendants and Applicable Defenses (by Complaint), #3 Exhibit 3 - Timeline of Key Events, #4 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiffs with Deficient Notices, #5 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiffs Who Failed to File Any Notice, #6 Exhibit 7 - Comparison of Allegations of Abuse, Actual Knowledge, Last Alleged Date of Tolling, and Filing of Notice, #7 Exhibit 8 - Plaintiffs Affirmatively Alleging Actual Knowledge of Claims, #8 Exhibit 9 - Plaintiffs Alleging Other Inappropriate Conduct by Nassar, #9 Exhibit 10 - Fraudulent Concealment Allegations, #10 Exhibit 11 - News Stories Related to Nassar and MSU (September 2016 January 2018), #11 Exhibit 12 - Implausible Allegations of Lack of Knowledge, #12 Exhibit 13 - Plaintiffs Alleging Title IX Standing, #13 Exhibit 14 - Plaintiffs Alleging Affordable Care Act Claims, #14 Exhibit 15 - Plaintiffs Alleging Trafficking Victims Protection Act Claims, #15 Exhibit 16 - Plaintiffs Alleging Elliott-Larsen Civil Rights Act Claims, #16 Exhibit 17 - Plaintiffs Alleging Assaults Exclusively at Non-MSU Locations, #17 Exhibit 18 - Plaintiffs Alleging That Parents/Guardians Were Present During Alleged Abuse, #18 Exhibit 19 - Plaintiffs Alleging Claims Barred by Statutes of Limitations, #19 Exhibit 20 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant Douglas Dietzel, #20 Exhibit 21 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant Lianna Hadden, #21 Exhibit 22 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant Kathie Klages, #22 Exhibit 23 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant Jeffrey Kovan, #23 Exhibit 24 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant Brooke Lemmen, #24 Exhibit 25 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant Kristine Moore, #25 Exhibit 26 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant Lou Anna Simon, #26 Exhibit 27 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant Gary Stollak, #27 Exhibit 28 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant William Strampel, #28 Exhibit 29 - Allegations Regarding MSU Individual Defendant Destiny Teachnor-Hauk) (Van Gelder, Amy)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT MOTION to dismiss the Operative Complaints in Consolidated and Related Actions (Omnibus) by defendants Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees; (Van Gelder, Amy)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Erin Kaufman as to Michigan State University waiver sent on 8/6/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; Michigan State University Board of Trustees waiver sent on 8/6/2019, answer due 10/7/2019 (Little, Jonathan)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees, Lawrence Gerard Nassar (mg)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Gordon J. Quist (mg)
August 6, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Brian Mark Schwartz on behalf of defendants Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Schwartz, Brian)
August 5, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Scott Robert Eldridge on behalf of defendants Michigan State University, Michigan State University Board of Trustees (Eldridge, Scott)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Carmody indicating that this case is cognate to 1:17-cv-29 (jlb)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Little, Jonathan)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Little, Jonathan)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Little, Jonathan)
August 2, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jonathan Charles Little on behalf of plaintiff Erin Kaufman (Little, Jonathan)
August 2, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Erin Kaufman in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4498382 (Little, Jonathan)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Michigan State University, Lawrence Gerard Nassar, The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University filed by Erin Kaufman (Little, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaufman v. Michigan State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Gerard Nassar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Trustees of Michigan State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan State University
Represented By: Brian Mark Schwartz
Represented By: Laura Bernescu
Represented By: Scott Robert Eldridge
Represented By: Amy Lynn Van Gelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan State University Board of Trustees
Represented By: Brian Mark Schwartz
Represented By: Laura Bernescu
Represented By: Scott Robert Eldridge
Represented By: Amy Lynn Van Gelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Kaufman
Represented By: Jonathan Charles Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Erin Kaufman
Represented By: Jonathan Charles Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?