Reece v. Evergreen Packaging, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Reece
Defendant: Evergreen Packaging, Inc. and Evergreen Packaging LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00631
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Evergreen Packaging LLC identifying Corporate Parent Reynolds Group Holdings Inc. for Evergreen Packaging LLC (Jackson, Russell)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CORRECTED ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 10/17/2019 at 04:00 PM before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; status report due by 10/11/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 9/17/2019 at 04:00 PM before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; status report due by 10/11/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Defendants Evergreen Packaging, Inc. and Evergreen Packaging LLC file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #4 with affirmative defenses by Evergreen Packaging LLC, Evergreen Packaging, Inc. (Jackson, Russell) Modified text on 9/19/2019 (ems).
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed; Evergreen Packaging LLC served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019 (Wilkinson, Mark)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Evergreen Packaging LLC (ems)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Evergreen Packaging, Inc. (ems)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kimberly Reece (Attachments: #1 Summons to Evergreen Packaging Inc., #2 Summons to Evergreen Packaging LLC) (Wilkinson, Mark) Modified text on 8/28/2019 (ems).
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Evergreen Packaging, Inc. (ems)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ems)
August 2, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Kimberly Reece in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4498789 (Wilkinson, Mark)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Kimberly Reece (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Wilkinson, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reece v. Evergreen Packaging, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Reece
Represented By: Mark S. Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evergreen Packaging, Inc.
Represented By: Russell W. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evergreen Packaging LLC
Represented By: Russell W. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?