Wesley v. Faith Plastics LLC
Plaintiff: Joseph Wesley
Defendant: Faith Plastics LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00632
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joseph Wesley as to Faith Plastics LLC served on 8/7/2019 answer due 10/7/2019 (Wilkinson, Mark) Modified text on 8/20/2019 (mg).
August 8, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Joseph Abraham Starr on behalf of defendant Faith Plastics LLC (Starr, Joseph)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Faith Plastics LLC (mg)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (mg)
August 2, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Joseph Wesley in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4498792 (Wilkinson, Mark)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Joseph Wesley (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Wilkinson, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wesley v. Faith Plastics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Wesley
Represented By: Mark S. Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faith Plastics LLC
Represented By: Joseph Abraham Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?