Dix et al v Nathanson
Plaintiff: Prince Albert Dix and Eddie Morris Scott
Defendant: Keith M. Nathanson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00638
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 10/28/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; status report due by 10/23/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Keith M. Nathanson (Costello, Thomas)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 motion for extension of time to answer; deadline extended to 9/25/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 #6 filed by Keith M. Nathanson (Costello, Thomas)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF in support of MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 #6 with Exhibit List and Exhibits filed by Keith M. Nathanson (Costello, Thomas)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 by defendant Keith M. Nathanson; (Costello, Thomas)
September 3, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Thomas George Costello on behalf of defendant Keith M. Nathanson (Costello, Thomas)
September 3, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of David Gregory Michael on behalf of defendant Keith M. Nathanson (Michael, David)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Keith M. Nathanson served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019 (Nelson, Michael)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Keith M. Nathanson (clw)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (clw)
August 7, 2019 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00 by attorney Michael O. Nelson on behalf of plaintiffs, receipt number 0646-4501662; for filing fee (mkc)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Nelson, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Keith M Nathanson filed by Prince A Dix, Eddie M Scott (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Nelson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dix et al v Nathanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prince Albert Dix
Represented By: Michael O. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Morris Scott
Represented By: Michael O. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith M. Nathanson
Represented By: David Gregory Michael
Represented By: Thomas George Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?