Mapson v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joan Mapson
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc., Endeavor Air, Inc. and Capital Region Airport Authority
Case Number: 1:2019cv00640
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Capital Region Airport Authority, Delta Air Lines, Inc., Endeavor Air, Inc. (ns)
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 First AMENDED COMPLAINT 09/30/2019 against All Defendants filed by Joan Mapson (Attachments: #1 Attachment Jury Demand, #2 Attachment Certificate of Service #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (Graham, Raoul) Modified text on 10/1/2019 (ns).
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT September 26, 2019 Rule 26(a)(1)(A) by plaintiff Joan Mapson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Graham, Raoul)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by plaintiff Joan Mapson (Graham, Raoul) Modified text on 9/23/2019 (ns).
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by plaintiff Joan Mapson (Graham, Raoul) Modified text on 9/23/2019 (ns).
September 20, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Joan Mapson in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4543816 (Graham, Raoul)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTES of scheduling conference held before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Court Reporter: Glenda Trexler) (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT submitted for filing by plaintiff Joan Mapson (Graham, Raoul)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 STATE COURT FILE received from the Clinton County Circuit Court (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Notice of Removal, #2 Attachment 2 - Summons) (ns)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 9/19/2019 at 04:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 9/13/2019 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker for all further proceedings pursuant to Order #4 by Judge Paul L. Maloney ; Judge Paul L. Maloney no longer assigned to case per Order #4 (ns)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Torpey, Scott)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL: District Judge Paul L. Maloney recused from this case; case to be reassigned; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Torpey, Scott)
August 8, 2019 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00 by Attorney Scott R. Torpey on behalf of defendant, receipt number 0646-4502980; for filing fee (mkc)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee re corporate disclosure statement (ns)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clinton County Circuit Court case number 19-11868-NO filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Pre-Suit Settlement Demand Letter) (Torpey, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mapson v. Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Scott R. Torpey
Represented By: Timothy James O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endeavor Air, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Region Airport Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Mapson
Represented By: Raoul Vernon Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?