Sconyers v. Gestamp Automotive
Plaintiff: Anthony Sconyers
Defendant: Gestamp Automotive
Case Number: 1:2019cv00658
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Copy of Default (Entry of) #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Anthony Sconyers 1117 Camp St. Lansing, MI 48906 (clw)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Gestamp Automotive (clw)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Gestamp Automotive (clw)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Gestamp Automotive served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019 (clw)
August 27, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gestamp Automotive and delivered to US Marshal for service (kw)
August 23, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Anthony Sconyers (clw)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw)
August 21, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Anthony Sconyers (clw)
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (clw)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (clw)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gestamp Automotive filed by Anthony Sconyers (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (clw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sconyers v. Gestamp Automotive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Sconyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gestamp Automotive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?