Jacobi v. Munger
Plaintiff: Tammy Jo Jacobi
Defendant: Eric Gordon Munger
Case Number: 1:2019cv00659
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER rescheduling Rule 16 conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 11/7/2019 at 09:30 AM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; the joint status report has already been filed; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF REFERENCE pursuant to consent of parties to dispositive jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge ; case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Buckman, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Counterclaim #7 with affirmative defenses by Tammy Jo Jacobi (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affirmative Defenses, #2 Attachment Proof of Service) (Buckman, Jeffrey)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 COUNTERCLAIM against Tammy Jo Jacobi filed by Eric Gordon Munger (Catrinar, Brian)
September 4, 2019 PAY.GOV refund in the amount of $400.00 to Jeffrey W Buckman pursuant to #6 (Financial Administrator, ced)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by plaintiff Tammy Jo Jacobi (Buckman, Jeffrey)
August 26, 2019 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00 by Attorney Jeffrey W. Buckman on behalf of plaintiff, receipt number AMIWDC-4517936; for filing fee (mkc) Modified text on 8/28/2019 (mkc).
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to complaint with affirmative defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by Eric Gordon Munger (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1) (Catrinar, Brian)
August 26, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Eric Gordon Munger in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4518188 (Catrinar, Brian)
August 26, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Brian Anthony Catrinar on behalf of defendant Eric Gordon Munger (Catrinar, Brian)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 10/18/2019 at 02:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 10/11/2019 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (mg)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Eric Gordon Munger re Notice of Removal, #1 (Lujan, Deborah)
August 19, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Deborah A. Lujan on behalf of defendant Eric Gordon Munger (Lujan, Deborah)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL to U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan-Southern Division from Allegan County Circuit Court case number 19-61464-NO filed by Eric Gordon Munger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -State Court Complaint with Jury Demand #2 Exhibit B- Case Scheduling Order, #3 Exhibit C- Attorney Email) (Lujan, Deborah) Modified text on 8/23/2019 (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobi v. Munger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Jo Jacobi
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Buckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Gordon Munger
Represented By: Deborah A. Lujan
Represented By: Brian Anthony Catrinar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?