Dehuelves et al v. Dehuelbes
Plaintiff: Irma I. Dehuelves and Moises M. Morejon
Defendant: Sergio R. Dehuelbes
Case Number: 1:2019cv00692
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Certified Copy of Judgment #9 , Order Regarding Report and Recommendation #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Irma I. Dehuelves and Moises M. Morejon (mg)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #7 ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
September 6, 2019 Copy of Report and Recommendation #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Irma I. Dehuelves and Moises M. Morejon (mg)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 ; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (jkw)
August 29, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #5 , Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Irma I. Dehuelves and Moises M. Morejon (jlb)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis as to Moises M. Morejon; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis as to Irma I. Dehuelves; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
August 28, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Irma I. Dehuelves and Moises M. Morejon (jlb)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of receipt of case (jlb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit for plaintiff Moises M. Morejon (jlb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit for plaintiff Irma I. Dehuelves (jlb) Modified text on 8/28/2019 (jlb).
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Sergio R. Dehuelbes filed by Irma I. Dehuelves, Moises M. Morejon (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2 (proposed summons)) (jlb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dehuelves et al v. Dehuelbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma I. Dehuelves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moises M. Morejon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio R. Dehuelbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?