DeVries v. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Plaintiff: Eric DeVries
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00708
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC (Rich, Trisha)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting STIPULATION #6 extending time to respond to Complaint ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 11/20/2019 at 03:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 11/13/2019 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (DISREGARD) ORDER granting STIPULATION #6 extending time to respond to Complaint ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) Modified on 10/2/2019; entered in error (clw).
October 1, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Trisha M. Rich on behalf of defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC (Rich, Trisha)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER granting defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC an extension of time to respond to the complaint by plaintiff Eric DeVries (Westbrook, Theodore) Modified text on 10/1/2019 (clw).
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Specialized Loan Servicing LLC served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019 (Westbrook, Theodore)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC (clw)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (clw)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Westbrook, Theodore)
September 3, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Eric DeVries in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4525637 (Westbrook, Theodore)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Specialized Loan Servicing LLC filed by Eric DeVries (Westbrook, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeVries v. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Trisha M. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric DeVries
Represented By: Theodore J. Westbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?