Richardson #373809 v. Thomas
Plaintiff: Matthew Richardson #373809
Defendant: J. Thomas
Case Number: 1:2019cv00711
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $12.00, receipt number GR068364; amount paid to date $42.77 (mkc)
October 11, 2019 Certified Copy of Opinion (Screening) #4 , Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case) #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Matthew Richardson #373809 (ems)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 OPINION; Judgment to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
September 18, 2019 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): initial filing fee installment in the amount of $30.77, receipt number GR067789; amount paid to date $30.77 (mkc)
September 4, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due in 28 Days - Prisoner, #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Matthew Richardson #373809 (ems)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $30.77 within 28 days; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; initial partial filing fee to be submitted by 10/2/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (jal)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by plaintiff Matthew Richardson #373809 (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (ems)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral and jury demand against J. Thomas filed by Matthew Richardson #373809 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Exhibits 1-4) (ems)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson #373809 v. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Richardson #373809
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?