Anderson et al v. Network Packaging Group, LLC
Plaintiff: David Anderson and Tech2Med, LLC
Defendant: Network Packaging Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00716
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING regarding MOTION for preliminary injunction that was previously set for 10/22/2019; motion hearing is set for 11/14/2019 at 10:00 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
October 15, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Network Packaging Group, LLC (Peterson, James)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #17 motion to adjourn preliminary injunction hearing; a notice rescheduling the hearing will issue; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
October 9, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to adjourn Preliminary Injunction Hearing #17 filed by Network Packaging Group, LLC (Peterson, James)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #10 motion to set aside default ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
October 4, 2019 Filing 21 ERRATA re #20 regarding exhibits to Affidavit of Karen Polkinghorne by defendant Network Packaging Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Peterson, James) Modified text on 10/7/2019 (ems).
October 2, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for preliminary injunction (as taken from State Court Complaint in #1 ) filed by Network Packaging Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit 3) (Peterson, James)
October 2, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to adjourn Preliminary Injunction Hearing #17 filed by David Anderson, Tech2Med, LLC (Furtado, George)
October 2, 2019 Filing 18 BRIEF in support of MOTION to adjourn Preliminary Injunction Hearing #17 filed by David Anderson, Tech2Med, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Furtado, George)
October 2, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to adjourn Preliminary Injunction Hearing by plaintiffs David Anderson, Tech2Med, LLC; (Furtado, George)
October 2, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response in Opposition, #15 filed by David Anderson, Tech2Med, LLC (Furtado, George)
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to set aside default #7 #10 filed by David Anderson, Tech2Med, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9) (Furtado, George)
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 STATE COURT FILE received from Kent County Circuit Court (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Attachment 2 - Motion for Injunction, #3 Attachment 3 - Notices, #4 Attachment 4 - Summons) (ems) Modified text on 9/27/2019 (ems).
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER; extending deadline to respond to motion for preliminary injunction to 10/2/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tech2Med, LLC (Furtado, George)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Network Packaging Group, LLC (Peterson, James)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to set aside default #7 by defendant Network Packaging Group, LLC; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Peterson, James)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Defendant's Deadline by defendant Network Packaging Group, LLC (Peterson, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiffs David Anderson, Tech2Med, LLC for Summons and Complaint, together with: Notice of Assignment to Specialized Business Docket; Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; Plaintiff's Brief in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and Notice of Hearing (Furtado, George)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 (SET ASIDE) DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant Network Packaging Group, LLC (ems) Modified text per Order #22 on 10/9/2019 (ems).
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Defendant Network Packaging Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons issued by the Kent County Circuit Court, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proof of Service of Complaint on Network Packaging Group, LLC, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of G. Will Furtado) (Furtado, George)
September 5, 2019 Certified Copy of Order, #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Kent County Circuit Court (ems)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding MOTION for preliminary injunction (as taken from State Court Complaint in #1 ): motion hearing is set for 10/22/2019 at 01:30 PM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 WRIT OF CERTIORARI; Kent County Circuit Court to transmit certified copies of entire state court file in the matter of Anderson, et al. v. Network Packaging Group, LLC, Case No. 19-07198-CBB by 9/19/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT re #1 to Notice of Removal by defendant Network Packaging Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Peterson, James) Modified text on 9/5/2019 (ems).
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (ems)
September 4, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Ian Alexander Northon on behalf of plaintiffs David Anderson, Tech2Med, LLC (Northon, Ian)
September 4, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of George Williams G. Furtado on behalf of plaintiffs David Anderson, Tech2Med, LLC (Furtado, George)
September 3, 2019 MOTION for preliminary injunction (as taken from State Court Complaint in #1 ) by plaintiffs David Anderson, Tech2Med, LLC; (ems)
September 3, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Network Packaging Group, LLC in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4526821 (Peterson, James)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Circuit Court case number 19-07198-CBB filed by Network Packaging Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Peterson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson et al v. Network Packaging Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Network Packaging Group, LLC
Represented By: James Richard Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Anderson
Represented By: George Williams G. Furtado
Represented By: Ian Alexander Northon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tech2Med, LLC
Represented By: George Williams G. Furtado
Represented By: Ian Alexander Northon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?