Duffy v. Collection Resources Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Sean Duffy
Defendant: John Does 1-25, Collection Resources Incorporated and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 1:2019cv00726
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to complaint, #1 with affirmative defenses by Collection Resources Incorporated (Shaver, David)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Collection Resources Incorporated identifying Other Affiliate QBE for Collection Resources Incorporated (Shaver, David) Modified text on 10/4/2019 (ems).
October 3, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of David Benjamin Shaver on behalf of defendant Collection Resources Incorporated (Shaver, David)
October 3, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jeffrey Charles Turner on behalf of defendant Collection Resources Incorporated (Turner, Jeffrey)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS returned executed; Collection Resources Incorporated served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019 (Saks, Yaakov)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Collection Resources Incorporated (ems)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (ems)
September 5, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Sean Duffy in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4529068 (Saks, Yaakov)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Collection Resources Incorporated, Unknown Parties filed by Sean Duffy (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A) (Saks, Yaakov) Modified text on 9/6/2019 (kvt). Modified text on 9/6/2019 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duffy v. Collection Resources Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collection Resources Incorporated
Represented By: David Benjamin Shaver
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Duffy
Represented By: Yaakov Saks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?