Rodriguez v. United Merchant Asset Recovery, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sarah Rodriguez
Defendant: United Merchant Asset Recovery of WNY, LLC, Eastview Advisory Group LLC, Brown & Brewer Inc, Ryan G. Hayes, MDRH Holdings LLC, Michael David Enzinna, Ross Wright & Group Inc, United Merchant Asset Recovery, LLC, Michael Jon Ditullio, Heston F. McClain, Rossi Hackerman and Associates, LLC, Chantelle Nicole McClain, Sean M. Millard, Dana D. Scott, Timothy D. Harvey, National Inquisition Services LLC, Shianne S. Burrows and Felicia Olivia McDowell
Case Number: 1:2019cv00730
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS returned executed; Dana D. Scott served on 10/16/2019, answer due 11/6/2019 (Rogers, Phillip)
October 2, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed; Michael David Enzinna served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019 (Rogers, Phillip)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed; Sean M. Millard served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019 (Rogers, Phillip)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed; Timothy D. Harvey served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019 (Rogers, Phillip)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed; National Inquisition Services LLC served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019 (Rogers, Phillip)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed; Felicia Olivia McDowell served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019 (Rogers, Phillip)
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed; Shianne S. Burrows served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019 (Rogers, Phillip)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Shianne S. Burrows, Timothy D. Harvey, Felicia Olivia McDowell, Sean M. Millard, National Inquisition Services LLC, Dana D. Scott (ns)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #6 (Rogers, Phillip)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Sarah Rodriguez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Rogers, Phillip)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re MDRH Holdings LLC, Michael Jon Ditullio and Ryan G. Hayes without prejudice filed by plaintiff Sarah Rodriguez (Rogers, Phillip)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Brown & Brewer Inc, Michael Jon Ditullio, Eastview Advisory Group LLC, Michael David Enzinna, Ryan G. Hayes, MDRH Holdings LLC, Chantelle Nicole McClain, Heston F. McClain, Ross Wright & Group Inc, Rossi Hackerman and Associates, LLC, United Merchant Asset Recovery of WNY, LLC, United Merchant Asset Recovery, LLC (ns)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ns)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Rogers, Phillip)
September 6, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Sarah Rodriguez in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4529888 (Rogers, Phillip)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Sarah Rodriguez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Rogers, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. United Merchant Asset Recovery, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Rodriguez
Represented By: Phillip C. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Merchant Asset Recovery of WNY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastview Advisory Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown & Brewer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan G. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MDRH Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael David Enzinna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Wright & Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Merchant Asset Recovery, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Jon Ditullio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heston F. McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rossi Hackerman and Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chantelle Nicole McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean M. Millard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana D. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy D. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Inquisition Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shianne S. Burrows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felicia Olivia McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?