Merriman v. Parker
Plaintiff: William Jon Merriman
Defendant: Timothy Parker
Case Number: 1:2019cv00740
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #8 sent via U.S. Mail to William Jon Merriman (ns)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of receipt of case (ns)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 3:18-cv-12220; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (jlg)
September 9, 2019 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Transferring Case to Western District of Michigan on William Merriman Pris. No. 405022 at 9825 Pail Street, Pittsford, MI 49271. (LWag) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/10/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Robert H. Cleland. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/10/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Certificate of Service by William Merriman. (SOso) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/10/2019.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by William Merriman. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/10/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/10/2019.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by William Merriman. (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/10/2019.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by William Merriman against Timothy Parker. (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 9/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merriman v. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Jon Merriman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?