Cleeves v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Cleeves
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C.R. Bard, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00741
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company, Corporate Parent C. R. Bard, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
November 8, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company for C.R. Bard, Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
October 29, 2019 Copy of Notice Cancelling Hearing #19 sent via U.S. Mail to attorneys Ben C Martin, Thomas William Arbon (ems)
October 28, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE cancelling Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/19. Matter to be rescheduled (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
October 28, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE to attorney Sanjay Ghosh regarding recent filing #17 (ems)
October 25, 2019 Filing 17 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER of Corrected Joint Report of the Parties and Proposed Scheduling Order by defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Ghosh, Sanjay) Modified text on 10/28/2019 (ems).
October 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE to attorney Amanda Barield Fopma regarding recent filing #15 (ems)
October 24, 2019 Filing 15 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Fopma, Amanda)
October 24, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Amanda Barield Fopma on behalf of defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. Appearance (Fopma, Amanda)
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER - SECOND NOTICE sent to attorney Thomas William Arbon; attorney admission deadline set for 11/6/2019; (jlb)
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER - SECOND NOTICE sent to attorney Ben C. Martin; attorney admission deadline set for 11/6/2019; (jlb)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Richard B. North, Jr., Esq. by defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
October 3, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Taylor Tapley Daly on behalf of defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Daly, Taylor)
October 3, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Sanjay Ghosh on behalf of defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
September 25, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John G. Mitchell on behalf of defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Mitchell, John)
September 12, 2019 Copy of Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, #11 sent via U.S. Mail to attorneys Ben C Martin, Thomas William Arbon, Richard B North, Jr (ems)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 10/31/2019 at 02:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 10/24/2019; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER from the District of Arizona re MDL 15-02641 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Submission, #2 Bard MDL Docket Sheet) (ems)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Richard B. North, Jr.; attorney admission deadline set for 10/8/2019; (ems)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Thomas William Arbon; attorney admission deadline set for 10/8/2019; (ems)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Ben C. Martin; attorney admission deadline set for 10/8/2019; (ems)
September 10, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #6 sent via U.S. Mail to attorneys Ben C Martin, Thomas William Arbon, Richard B North, Jr (ems)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of receipt of case (ems)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Arizona, their case number 2:18-cv-02216; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (jlg)
September 9, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Western District of Michigan via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]
July 15, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-02216-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]
July 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15728379 filed by David Cleeves. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleeves v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Sanjay Ghosh
Represented By: John G. Mitchell
Represented By: Amanda Barield Fopma
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Sanjay Ghosh
Represented By: John G. Mitchell
Represented By: Amanda Barield Fopma
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Cleeves
Represented By: Thomas William Arbon
Represented By: Ben C Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?