Iacopelli et al v. West Michigan Commercial Property Advisors, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lynn Iacopelli and Matthew Iacopelli
Defendant: Cascade Place Condominium Association, Greenridge Realty, Inc. and West Michigan Commercial Property Advisors, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00742
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Ellen S Carmody
2 Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Sally J. Berens under #Administrative Order No. 19-CA-093, Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody is no longer assigned to the case (sjc)
October 31, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Greenridge Realty, Inc. (Schipper, James)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting STIPULATION #13 ; the deadline for Defendant Cascade Place Condominium Association to answer Plaintiffs' complaint is extended to 11/15/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Defendant Cascade Place Condominium Association's Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiffs' Complaint by defendant Cascade Place Condominium Association (Doezema, James)
October 28, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James B. Doezema on behalf of defendant Cascade Place Condominium Association (Doezema, James)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting stipulated proposed order #10 ; the deadline for Defendant Greenridge Realty, Inc. to answer Plaintiffs' complaint is extended to 10/31/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting stipulated proposed order #9 ; the deadline for Defendant West Michigan Commercial Property Advisors, Inc. to answer Plaintiffs' complaint is extended to 11/15/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Greenridge Realty's Deadline to File Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiffs' Complaint by defendant Greenridge Realty, Inc. (Schipper, James)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Answer Date by defendant West Michigan Commercial Property Advisors, Inc. (Pacific, Dean)
October 24, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Dean F. Pacific on behalf of defendant West Michigan Commercial Property Advisors, Inc. (Pacific, Dean)
October 16, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James L. Schipper on behalf of defendant Greenridge Realty, Inc. (Schipper, James)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed; Greenridge Realty, Inc. served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019 (Howard, Robert)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed; Cascade Place Condominium Association served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019 (Howard, Robert)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; West Michigan Commercial Property Advisors, Inc. served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019 (Howard, Robert)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Cascade Place Condominium Association, Greenridge Realty, Inc., West Michigan Commercial Property Advisors, Inc. (mg)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (mg)
September 10, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Lynn Iacopelli, Matthew Iacopelli in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4532577 (Howard, Robert)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Howard, Robert)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for TRIAL BY JURY by plaintiffs Lynn Iacopelli, Matthew Iacopelli (Howard, Robert)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Matthew Iacopelli, Lynn Iacopelli (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Howard, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iacopelli et al v. West Michigan Commercial Property Advisors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cascade Place Condominium Association
Represented By: James B. Doezema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenridge Realty, Inc.
Represented By: James L. Schipper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Michigan Commercial Property Advisors, Inc.
Represented By: Dean F. Pacific
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Iacopelli
Represented By: Robert Michael Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Iacopelli
Represented By: Robert Michael Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?