Caswell v. Bronson Methodist Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Taylor Caswell
Defendant: Heather Foulke, Bethany Gonzalez, Lanie Santos, Brendan Collins, Grace Health, Patricia Zull, Krista Runyan, Lindsay Wriston, Bronson Methodist Hospital, Hannah Marie Thomas-Gentz and Jeffrey Custer
Case Number: 1:2019cv00810
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #23 motion to consolidate cases; consolidating case nos. 1:19-cv-720 and 1:19-cv-810; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
November 26, 2019 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Meritorious Defense of Anne Taylor, RNC-OB by defendant Bronson Methodist Hospital (Suhrheinrich, Richard)
November 22, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re JOINT MOTION to consolidate cases #23 filed by Brendan M. Collins, Jeffrey Custer, Heather Foulke, Bethany Gonzalez, Grace Health Inc., Krista M. Runyan, Lanie C. Santos, Hannah Marie Thomas-Gentz, United States of America, Lindsay K. Wriston, Patricia R. Zull (Almassian, Carolyn)
November 22, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion to Consolidate Cases, #23 filed by Brendan M. Collins, Jeffrey Custer, Heather Foulke, Bethany Gonzalez, Grace Health Inc., Krista M. Runyan, Lanie C. Santos, Hannah Marie Thomas-Gentz, United States of America, Lindsay K. Wriston, Patricia R. Zull (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Orer to Consolidate Actions) (Almassian, Carolyn)
November 22, 2019 Filing 23 JOINT MOTION to consolidate cases by defendants Brendan M. Collins, Jeffrey Custer, Heather Foulke, Bethany Gonzalez, Grace Health Inc., Krista M. Runyan, Lanie C. Santos, Hannah Marie Thomas-Gentz, United States of America, Lindsay K. Wriston, Patricia R. Zull; (Almassian, Carolyn)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER amending case caption re #8 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 1/6/2020 at 11:30 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 12/30/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
November 18, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT re #18 Affidavit of Meritorious Defense - Scane by defendants Brendan M. Collins, Jeffrey Custer, Heather Foulke, Bethany Gonzalez, Grace Health Inc., Krista M. Runyan, Lanie C. Santos, Hannah Marie Thomas-Gentz, Lindsay K. Wriston, Patricia R. Zull (Almassian, Carolyn)
November 18, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT re #18 Affidavit of Meritorious Defense - Simmerman by defendants Brendan M. Collins, Jeffrey Custer, Heather Foulke, Bethany Gonzalez, Grace Health Inc., Krista M. Runyan, Lanie C. Santos, Hannah Marie Thomas-Gentz, Lindsay K. Wriston, Patricia R. Zull (Almassian, Carolyn)
November 18, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to complaint with affirmative defenses by Brendan M. Collins, Jeffrey Custer, Heather Foulke, Bethany Gonzalez, Grace Health Inc., Krista M. Runyan, Lanie C. Santos, Hannah Marie Thomas-Gentz, Lindsay K. Wriston, Patricia R. Zull (Almassian, Carolyn) Modified text on 11/19/2019 (ns).
November 2, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Sally J. Berens under #Administrative Order No. 19-CA-093, Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody is no longer assigned to the case (sjc)
October 23, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses Reliance on Jury Demand by Bronson Methodist Hospital (Suhrheinrich, Richard)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER striking answer #14 ; Defendant Bronson Methodist Hospital shall file a corrected answer no later than 7 days from the date of this Order; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 (STRICKEN) ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses Reliance on Jury Demand by Bronson Methodist Hospital (Suhrheinrich, Richard) Modified text on 10/22/2019; stricken per #15 (mg).
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #3 motion for extension of time; Defendants Grace Health Inc., Heather Foulke, Hannah Marie Thomas-Gentz, Lanie C. Santos, Krista M. Runyan, Bethany Gonzalez, Patricia R. Zull, Jeffrey Custer, Brendan M. Collins, and Lindsay K. Wriston's response(s) to the complaint due 11/18/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ns)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Carmody indicating that this case is related to 1:19-cv-720 (mkc)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Brendan Collins, Jeffrey Custer, Heather Foulke, Bethany Gonzalez, Grace Health, Krista Runyan, Lanie Santos, Hannah Marie Thomas-Gentz, Lindsay Wriston, Patricia Zull re Memorandum in Support of a Motion, #4 , Notice of Removal, #1 , Certification Re Individual Defendants Acting on Behalf of the US, #7 , Notice (Other), #8 , Certificate of Service,,, #9 , PROPOSED ORDER regarding Motion For Extension of Time in Which to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by defendants Brendan Collins, Jeffrey Custer, Heather Foulke, Bethany Gonzalez, Grace Health, Krista Runyan, Lanie Santos, Hannah Marie Thomas-Gen #5 , MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 #3 , Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence,, #6 (Almassian, Carolyn)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Brendan Collins, Jeffrey Custer, Heather Foulke, Bethany Gonzalez, Grace Health, Krista Runyan, Lanie Santos, Hannah Marie Thomas-Gentz, Lindsay Wriston, Patricia Zull re Memorandum in Support of a Motion, #4 , Notice of Removal, #1 , Certification Re Individual Defendants Acting on Behalf of the US, #7 , Notice (Other), #8 , PROPOSED ORDER regarding Motion For Extension of Time in Which to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by defendants Brendan Collins, Jeffrey Custer, Heather Foulke, Bethany Gonzalez, Grace Health, Krista Runyan, Lanie Santos, Hannah Marie Thomas-Gen #5 , MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 #3 , Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence,, #6 (Almassian, Carolyn)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Substitution by defendants Brendan Collins, Jeffrey Custer, Heather Foulke, Bethany Gonzalez, Grace Health, Krista Runyan, Lanie Santos, Hannah Marie Thomas-Gentz, Lindsay Wriston, Patricia Zull (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Amending Caption) (Almassian, Carolyn)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION deeming individual defendants to be acting in the scope of their employment or office on behalf of the United States by defendants Brendan Collins, Jeffrey Custer, Heather Foulke, Bethany Gonzalez, Grace Health, Krista Runyan, Lanie Santos, Hannah Marie Thomas-Gentz, Lindsay Wriston, Patricia Zull (Almassian, Carolyn)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re PROPOSED ORDER regarding Motion For Extension of Time in Which to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by defendants Brendan Collins, Jeffrey Custer, Heather Foulke, Bethany Gonzalez, Grace Health, Krista Runyan, Lanie Santos, Hannah Marie Thomas-Gen #5 , MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 #3 filed by Brendan Collins, Jeffrey Custer, Heather Foulke, Bethany Gonzalez, Grace Health, Krista Runyan, Lanie Santos, Hannah Marie Thomas-Gentz, Lindsay Wriston, Patricia Zull (Almassian, Carolyn)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Motion For Extension of Time in Which to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by defendants Brendan Collins, Jeffrey Custer, Heather Foulke, Bethany Gonzalez, Grace Health, Krista Runyan, Lanie Santos, Hannah Marie Thomas-Gentz, Lindsay Wriston, Patricia Zull (Almassian, Carolyn)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, #3 filed by Brendan Collins, Jeffrey Custer, Heather Foulke, Bethany Gonzalez, Grace Health, Krista Runyan, Lanie Santos, Hannah Marie Thomas-Gentz, Lindsay Wriston, Patricia Zull (Almassian, Carolyn)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 by defendants Brendan Collins, Jeffrey Custer, Heather Foulke, Bethany Gonzalez, Grace Health, Krista Runyan, Lanie Santos, Hannah Marie Thomas-Gentz, Lindsay Wriston, Patricia Zull; (Almassian, Carolyn)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING notice of removal re #1 directed to by defendants Brendan Collins, Jeffrey Custer, Heather Foulke, Bethany Gonzalez, Grace Health, Krista Runyan, Lanie Santos, Hannah Marie Thomas-Gentz, Lindsay Wriston, Patricia Zull (Almassian, Carolyn)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Calhoun County Circuit Court case number 19-2515-NH filed by Lanie Santos, Lindsay Wriston, Grace Health, Bethany Gonzalez, Jeffrey Custer, Hannah Marie Thomas-Gentz, Patricia Zull, Heather Foulke, Brendan Collins, Krista Runyan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint) (Almassian, Carolyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caswell v. Bronson Methodist Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Foulke
Represented By: Carolyn Ann Almassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethany Gonzalez
Represented By: Carolyn Ann Almassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lanie Santos
Represented By: Carolyn Ann Almassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brendan Collins
Represented By: Carolyn Ann Almassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Health
Represented By: Carolyn Ann Almassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Zull
Represented By: Carolyn Ann Almassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krista Runyan
Represented By: Carolyn Ann Almassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsay Wriston
Represented By: Carolyn Ann Almassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bronson Methodist Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannah Marie Thomas-Gentz
Represented By: Carolyn Ann Almassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Custer
Represented By: Carolyn Ann Almassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Caswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?