Boerma v. Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan et al
Plaintiff: Michael Boerma
Defendant: Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan, General Mills, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Blue Plus of Minnesota and Bluecross Blueshield Blueplus of Minnesota
Case Number: 1:2019cv00829
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan (Goldenbogen, Robert)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed; General Mills, Inc. served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019 (James, Thomas)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed; Bluecross Blueshield Blueplus of Minnesota served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019 (James, Thomas)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019 (James, Thomas)
October 23, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Thomas W. James on behalf of plaintiff Michael Boerma (James, Thomas)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Bluecross Blueshield Blueplus of Minnesota, Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan, General Mills, Inc. (mg)
October 18, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Alexus Brieanne Ringstad on behalf of plaintiff Michael Boerma Appearance of Attorney Thomas W. James on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Boerma (Ringstad, Alexus)
October 18, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Michael Boerma in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4569369 (Ringstad, Alexus)
October 18, 2019 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Bluecross Blueshield Blueplus of Minnesota, Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan, General Mills, Inc. (fililng fee not paid) (mg)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (mg)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Kent indicating that this case is related to 1:18-cv-579 (mkc)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Attachments: #1 Summons Blue Cross, #2 General Mills) (Ringstad, Alexus)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Michael Boerma (Ringstad, Alexus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boerma v. Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan
Represented By: Robert L. Goldenbogen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Mills, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield Blue Plus of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluecross Blueshield Blueplus of Minnesota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Boerma
Represented By: Alexus Brieanne Ringstad
Represented By: Thomas W. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?