Lee Contracting, Inc. v. Shore Western Manufacturing et al
Plaintiff: Lee Contracting, Inc.
Defendant: Shore Western Manufacturing and Nicholas Schroeder
Case Number: 1:2019cv00831
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Sally J. Berens under #Administrative Order No. 19-CA-093, Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody is no longer assigned to the case (asm)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Lee Contracting, Inc. as to Nicholas Schroeder waiver sent on 10/15/2019, answer due 12/16/2019 (Price, Michael)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Lee Contracting, Inc. as to Shore Western Manufacturing waiver sent on 10/15/2019, answer due 12/16/2019 (Price, Michael)
October 11, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Brent William Warner on behalf of plaintiff Lee Contracting, Inc. (Warner, Brent)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lee Contracting, Inc. (Price, Michael)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Nicholas Schroeder, Shore Western Manufacturing (ems)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (ems)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Price, Michael)
October 11, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Lee Contracting, Inc. in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4563732 (Price, Michael)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Nicholas Schroeder, Shore Western Manufacturing filed by Lee Contracting, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Proposal, #2 Exhibit 2-Purchase Order, #3 Exhibit 3-Proposal, #4 Exhibit 4-Schroeder Email 10/3/19, #5 Exhibit 5-Invoice, #6 Exhibit 6-Invoice, #7 Exhibit 7-Shore Western SI-550 Filed 3/15/19) (Price, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee Contracting, Inc. v. Shore Western Manufacturing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shore Western Manufacturing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: Brent William Warner
Represented By: Michael T. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?