Calhoun #379175 v. Tyler et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Eugene Calhoun #379175
Defendant: Jeffrey B. Taylor, Sharon J. Tyler, Niles, City of, St. Joseph, City of and Charles T. Lasata
Case Number: 1:2019cv00896
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Ellen S Carmody
2 Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Copy of Deficiency Order (Appeal) #13 sent via U.S. Mail to Samuel Eugene Calhoun #379175 (ems)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DEFICIENCY ORDER regarding APPEAL: plaintiff has failed to pay the appeal fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
December 10, 2019 Copy of Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel #12 sent via U.S. Mail to Samuel Eugene Calhoun #379175 (ems)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #8 motion to amend/correct; denying #9 motion to appoint counsel; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER FROM CCA regarding appeal #10 indicating appeal has been docketed as USCA case number 19-2396 (ems)
December 4, 2019 CASE NUMBER 19-2396 assigned by the Sixth Circuit to appeal #10 (mkc)
December 2, 2019 Copy of Notice of Appeal #10 and docket sheet sent via U.S. Mail to Samuel Eugene Calhoun #379175 (ems)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEAL re #7 , #6 by plaintiff Samuel Eugene Calhoun #379175 (ems)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to appoint counsel by plaintiff Samuel Eugene Calhoun #379175; (ems)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to amend/correct #1 (in Cover Letter form) by plaintiff Samuel Eugene Calhoun #379175; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Proposed Amended Complaint with Exhibits) (ems)
November 20, 2019 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $4.59, receipt number KZ003998; amount paid to date $4.59 (jlb)
November 13, 2019 Certified Copy of Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case), #7 , Opinion (Screening) #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Samuel Eugene Calhoun #379175 (ems)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT that Plaintiff's federal claims are dismissed with prejudice on grounds of immunity and for failure to state a claim; Plaintiff's state-law claims are dismissed without prejudice; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 OPINION; Judgment to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
November 4, 2019 Copy of Notice Regarding Reassignment (ESC), #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Samuel Eugene Calhoun #379175 (ems)
November 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Sally J. Berens under #Administrative Order No. 19-CA-093, Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody is no longer assigned to the case (sjc)
October 29, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due in 28 Days - Prisoner, #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Samuel Eugene Calhoun #379175 (ems)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $4.59 within 28 days; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; (initial partial filing fee to be submitted by 11/25/2019); signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (jal)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by plaintiff Samuel Eugene Calhoun #379175 (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (ems)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Samuel Eugene Calhoun #379175; (ems)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral and jury demand (signature as taken from #2 and #3 ) against Charles T. Lasata, Niles, City of, St. Joseph, City of, Jeffrey B. Taylor, Sharon J. Tyler filed by Samuel Eugene Calhoun #379175 (ems) Modified text on 10/28/2019 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calhoun #379175 v. Tyler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey B. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon J. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niles, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles T. Lasata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Eugene Calhoun #379175
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?