Spink v. Gaylord et al
Plaintiff: Charise Spink
Defendant: Greg Snyder, Lynne M. Buday, Steven Hull, Pauline Jaquish, Clearwater, Township of, Phil Lewis, Matt Fournier, Unknown Part(y)(ies), Gary Hagler, Jim Maike, Greg Bradley, Betty Dermyer, Roger Ouwinga, Kevin Hughes, Mike Gaylord, Barbara Crambell, Judy Michois, Gary L. Taylor, Shelly Pinkeiman, James Sweet, Young, Graham & Wendling, PC, Catherine D. Jasinski, Tom O'Neil, Kyle Anderson, Chris Bowen, Ray Steinke, Kyle Beaver, Charles Lange, Adam Parzych, Colin G. Hunter, Kathy Eldridge, Nicole E. Essad, Thomas Reichard, Richard Schmidt, Holly Pennioni, Bryan Koik, Patty Cox, Dawn Martin, Jeremy Morrison, The Board of Health, Hubert Zuidrveen, Denny Powers and Martha Meyette
Case Number: 1:2019cv00900
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REJECTING Amended Complaint submitted by Charise Spink; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw)
December 23, 2019 Filing 30 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #29 filed by Catherine D. Jasinski (Conlon, Michael)
December 23, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendant Catherine D. Jasinski; (Conlon, Michael)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 (DISREGARD) ORDER REJECTING Amended Complaint submitted by Charise Spink; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) Modified on 12/23/2019; entered in error (clw).
December 17, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Mary C. Aretha on behalf of defendants Nicole E. Essad, Young, Graham & Wendling, PC (Aretha, Mary)
December 12, 2019 Copy of Order on Motion for Order #27 sent via U.S. Mail to Charise Spink (ns)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying #25 motion for order; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
December 6, 2019 Filing 26 PRO SE MOTION for leave to file and receive service electronically by plaintiff Charise Spink; (ns)
December 6, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for order named as "Motion for relief of failure to serve summons to defendants along with complaint" by plaintiff Charise Spink; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ns)
November 27, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in support of MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Brief in Support and Certificate of Service #15 (CORRECTED) filed by Kyle Anderson, Patty Cox, Betty Dermyer, Matt Fournier, Kevin Hughes, Steven Hull, Pauline Jaquish, Bryan Koik, Charles Lange, Phil Lewis, Jim Maike, Dawn Martin, Martha Meyette, Judy Michois, Tom O'Neil, Roger Ouwinga, Shelly Pinkeiman, Denny Powers, Thomas Reichard, Richard Schmidt, Ray Steinke, James Sweet, Gary L. Taylor, The Board of Health, Hubert Zuidrveen (Brege, Andrew)
November 27, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in support of MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Brief in Support and Certificate of Service #15 filed by Kyle Anderson, Patty Cox, Betty Dermyer, Matt Fournier, Kevin Hughes, Steven Hull, Pauline Jaquish, Bryan Koik, Charles Lange, Phil Lewis, Jim Maike, Dawn Martin, Martha Meyette, Judy Michois, Tom O'Neil, Roger Ouwinga, Shelly Pinkeiman, Denny Powers, Thomas Reichard, Richard Schmidt, Ray Steinke, James Sweet, Gary L. Taylor, The Board of Health, Hubert Zuidrveen (Brege, Andrew)
November 22, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in support of MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Brief in Support and Certificate of Service #15 filed by Young, Graham & Wendling, PC (Anderson, David)
November 21, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to supplement #12 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)5 and 12(b)6 by defendant Catherine D. Jasinski; (Conlon, Michael)
November 21, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion #14 to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(5) and 12(b)(6) filed by Catherine D. Jasinski (Conlon, Michael)
November 19, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Catherine D. Jasinski re MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Motion to Dismiss #12 , Brief in Support of a Motion #14 , Affidavit in Support #13 (Conlon, Michael)
November 19, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Chris Bowen, Gary Hagler, Holly Pennioni re Attorney Appearance (Bock, Daniel)
November 19, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Chris Bowen, Gary Hagler, Holly Pennioni (Bock, Daniel)
November 19, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Brief in Support and Certificate of Service #15 filed by Kyle Beaver, Lynne M. Buday, Colin G. Hunter (Vander Laan, Allan)
November 19, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Brief in Support and Certificate of Service by defendants Kyle Beaver, Lynne M. Buday, Colin G. Hunter; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Brief in Support) (Vander Laan, Allan)
November 19, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Daniel Paul Bock on behalf of defendants Chris Bowen, Gary Hagler, Holly Pennioni (Bock, Daniel)
November 19, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Bradley Charles Yanalunas on behalf of defendants Kyle Beaver, Lynne M. Buday, Colin G. Hunter (Yanalunas, Bradley)
November 19, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Allan C. Vander Laan on behalf of defendants Kyle Beaver, Lynne M. Buday, Colin G. Hunter (Vander Laan, Allan)
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Motion to Dismiss #12 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Catherine D. Jasinski (Conlon, Michael)
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT in support of Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim #12 Affidavit filed by Catherine D. Jasinski (Conlon, Michael)
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Motion to Dismiss by defendant Catherine D. Jasinski; (Conlon, Michael)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim and Brief in Support by defendants Nicole E. Essad, Young, Graham & Wendling, PC; (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A-District Court Civil Infraction Hearing Transcript, #3 Exhibit B-Citations, #4 Exhibit C-Clearwater Township Ordinances, #5 Exhibit D-Enforcement Order Following Formal Hearing, #6 Exhibit E-Circuit Court Hearing, #7 Exhibit F-Michigan Court of Appeals Order, #8 Exhibit G-Show Cause Motion, #9 Exhibit H-Show Cause Order, #10 Exhibit I-Affidavit of Nicole E. Essad) (Anderson, David)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #9 filed by Kyle Anderson, Patty Cox, Betty Dermyer, Matt Fournier, Kevin Hughes, Steven Hull, Pauline Jaquish, Bryan Koik, Charles Lange, Phil Lewis, Jim Maike, Dawn Martin, Martha Meyette, Judy Michois, Tom O'Neil, Roger Ouwinga, Shelly Pinkeiman, Denny Powers, Thomas Reichard, Richard Schmidt, Ray Steinke, James Sweet, Gary L. Taylor, The Board of Health, Hubert Zuidrveen (Brege, Andrew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendants Kyle Anderson, Patty Cox, Betty Dermyer, Matt Fournier, Kevin Hughes, Steven Hull, Pauline Jaquish, Bryan Koik, Charles Lange, Phil Lewis, Jim Maike, Dawn Martin, Martha Meyette, Judy Michois, Tom O'Neil, Roger Ouwinga, Shelly Pinkeiman, Denny Powers, Thomas Reichard, Richard Schmidt, Ray Steinke, James Sweet, Gary L. Taylor, The Board of Health, Hubert Zuidrveen; (Brege, Andrew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 RELIANCE Upon Jury Demand by defendants Greg Bradley, Clearwater, Township of, Barbara Crambell, Kathy Eldridge, Mike Gaylord, Jeremy Morrison, Adam Parzych, Greg Snyder (Wierda, Bradley) Modified text on 11/26/2019 (ns).
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to complaint with affirmative defenses by Greg Bradley, Clearwater, Township of, Barbara Crambell, Kathy Eldridge, Mike Gaylord, Jeremy Morrison, Adam Parzych, Greg Snyder (Wierda, Bradley) Modified text on 11/19/2019 (ns).
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Charise Spink re Summons Returned Executed #5 (ns)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Gary Hagler served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019 (ns)
November 11, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of David C. Anderson on behalf of defendants Nicole E. Essad, Young, Graham & Wendling, PC (Anderson, David)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Charise Spink re Summons Returned Executed,,,,,,,,, #3 (ns)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS returned executed; Kyle Anderson served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019; Chris Bowen served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019; Greg Bradley served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; Lynne M. Buday served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019; Clearwater, Township of served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019; Patty Cox served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019; Barbara Crambell served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; Betty Dermyer served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; Kathy Eldridge served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019; Nicole E. Essad served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019; Matt Fournier served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; Mike Gaylord served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019; Kevin Hughes served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; Steven Hull served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; Colin G. Hunter served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019; Pauline Jaquish served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; Catherine D. Jasinski served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; Bryan Koik served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; Charles Lange served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; Phil Lewis served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; Jim Maike served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; Dawn Martin served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; Martha Meyette served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; Judy Michois served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; Jeremy Morrison served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019; Tom O'Neil served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; Roger Ouwinga served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; Adam Parzych served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; Holly Pennioni served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019; Shelly Pinkeiman served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; Denny Powers served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; Thomas Reichard served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; Richard Schmidt served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; Greg Snyder served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; Ray Steinke served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; James Sweet served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019; Gary L. Taylor served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; The Board of Health served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019; Young, Graham & Wendling, PC served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019; Hubert Zuidrveen served on 10/28/2019, answer due 11/18/2019 (ns)
November 7, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Bradley D. Wierda on behalf of defendants Greg Bradley, Clearwater, Township of, Barbara Crambell, Kathy Eldridge, Mike Gaylord, Jeremy Morrison, Adam Parzych, Greg Snyder (Wierda, Bradley)
October 30, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Charise Spink (ns)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of receipt of case (ns)
October 28, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Kyle Anderson, Kyle Beaver, Chris Bowen, Greg Bradley, Lynne M. Buday, Clearwater, Township of, Patty Cox, Barbara Crambell, Betty Dermyer, Kathy Eldridge, Nicole E. Essad, Matt Fournier, Mike Gaylord, Gary Hagler, Kevin Hughes, Steven Hull, Colin G. Hunter, Pauline Jaquish, Catherine D. Jasinski, Bryan Koik, Charles Lange, Phil Lewis, Jim Maike, Dawn Martin, Martha Meyette, Judy Michois, Jeremy Morrison, Tom O'Neil, Roger Ouwinga, Adam Parzych, Holly Pennioni, Shelly Pinkeiman, Denny Powers, Thomas Reichard, Richard Schmidt, Greg Snyder, Ray Steinke, James Sweet, Gary L. Taylor, The Board of Health, Young, Graham & Wendling, PC, Hubert Zuidrveen (ns)
October 28, 2019 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00, receipt number LN002702; for filing fee (ns)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Charise Spink (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits A-E) (ns)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spink v. Gaylord et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Snyder
Represented By: Bradley D. Wierda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynne M. Buday
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Represented By: Bradley Charles Yanalunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Hull
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pauline Jaquish
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearwater, Township of
Represented By: Bradley D. Wierda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Lewis
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Fournier
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Part(y)(ies)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Hagler
Represented By: Daniel Paul Bock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Maike
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Bradley
Represented By: Bradley D. Wierda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Dermyer
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Ouwinga
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Hughes
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Gaylord
Represented By: Bradley D. Wierda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Crambell
Represented By: Bradley D. Wierda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Michois
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary L. Taylor
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly Pinkeiman
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Sweet
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young, Graham & Wendling, PC
Represented By: David C. Anderson
Represented By: Mary C. Aretha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine D. Jasinski
Represented By: Michael I. Conlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom O'Neil
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Anderson
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Bowen
Represented By: Daniel Paul Bock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Steinke
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Beaver
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Represented By: Bradley Charles Yanalunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Lange
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Parzych
Represented By: Bradley D. Wierda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin G. Hunter
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Represented By: Bradley Charles Yanalunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Eldridge
Represented By: Bradley D. Wierda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole E. Essad
Represented By: David C. Anderson
Represented By: Mary C. Aretha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Reichard
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Schmidt
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Pennioni
Represented By: Daniel Paul Bock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Koik
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patty Cox
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Martin
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Morrison
Represented By: Bradley D. Wierda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Health
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubert Zuidrveen
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denny Powers
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Meyette
Represented By: Andrew James Brege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charise Spink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?