Moralez v. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission et al
Plaintiff: RESTRICTED FILER John Moralez
Defendant: Linda Sankovich, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission and Janet Dhillon
Case Number: 1:2019cv00957
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for summary judgment by plaintiff John Moralez; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (clw)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 OBJECTION by plaintiff John Moralez to Report and Recommendation #8 (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 and 2) (jlg)
December 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to serve the complaint by the US Marshals by plaintiff John Moralez; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (ndj)
December 26, 2019 Filing 9 OBJECTION by plaintiff John Moralez to Report and Recommendation #8 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhbit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (ndj)
December 19, 2019 Copy of Report and Recommendation #8 sent via U.S. Mail to John Moralez (ndj)
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's claims be dismissed with prejudice; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (cbh)
November 18, 2019 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #7 sent via U.S. Mail to John Moralez (ns)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
November 15, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #6 sent via U.S. Mail to John Moralez (ns)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
November 14, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #5 sent via U.S. Mail to John Moralez (mg)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of receipt of case (mg)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens indicating that this case is related to 1:18-cv-634. (mg)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (mg)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (mg)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT titled as "Plaintiff's motion for mandamus relief in instant case" against Janet Dhillon, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Linda Sankovich filed by John Moralez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moralez v. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Sankovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Dhillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RESTRICTED FILER John Moralez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?