3DXTech LLC v. Tiered Integration, LLC
Plaintiff: 3DXTech LLC
Defendant: Tiered Integration, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00968
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of dismissal by plaintiff 3DXTech LLC (Pirrotta, Salvatore)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER; deadline to answer or otherwise respond to complaint extended to 12/20/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
December 6, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint By Fourteen Days by defendant Tiered Integration, LLC (Signs, Christiana)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER approving STIPULATION #6 ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint By Fourteen Days by defendant Tiered Integration, LLC (Signs, Christiana)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tiered Integration, LLC (Signs, Christiana)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 3DXTech LLC (Pirrotta, Salvatore)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 Corrected Exhibit A EXHIBIT re #1 to Notice of Removal by defendant Tiered Integration, LLC (Signs, Christiana)
November 18, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Tiered Integration, LLC in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4625116 (Signs, Christiana)
November 18, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Salvatore W. Pirrotta on behalf of plaintiff 3DXTech LLC (Pirrotta, Salvatore)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee re corporate disclosure statement (clw)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 17th Circuit Court, Kent County case number 19-07557 filed by Tiered Integration, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Signs, Christiana) Modified text on 11/15/2019 (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 3DXTech LLC v. Tiered Integration, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3DXTech LLC
Represented By: Salvatore W. Pirrotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiered Integration, LLC
Represented By: Christiana L. Signs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?