Hill v. Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC
Plaintiff: Ulysses Hill
Defendant: Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01004
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER regarding preparation of joint status report: joint status report due by 2/7/2020; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
January 16, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC (Marcus, Morgan)
January 16, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Deborah A. Lujan on behalf of defendant Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC (Lujan, Deborah)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting STIPULATION for extension of time #5 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CL Holdings, LLC for Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC (Marcus, Morgan)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for extension of time to file responsive pleading by defendant Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC (Marcus, Morgan)
December 18, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Morgan I. Marcus on behalf of defendant Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC (Marcus, Morgan)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS returned executed; Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC served on 12/5/2019, answer due 12/26/2019 (Davidson, Joseph)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC (clw)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (clw)
November 25, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Ulysses Hill in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4649979 (Davidson, Joseph)
November 25, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Joseph Scott Davidson on behalf of plaintiff Ulysses Hill (Davidson, Joseph)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC filed by Ulysses Hill (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Davidson, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ulysses Hill
Represented By: Joseph Scott Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC
Represented By: Morgan I. Marcus
Represented By: Deborah A. Lujan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?