Syroka v. Michigan, State of et al
Plaintiff: Derek Syroka
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer and Michigan, State of
Case Number: 1:2019cv01007
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 18:241
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT re complaint #1 by plaintiff Derek Syroka (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5) (clw)
December 31, 2019 Filing 8 OBJECTION by plaintiff Derek Syroka to Report and Recommendation #7 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4) (jlg)
December 30, 2019 Copy of Report and Recommendation #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Derek Syroka (ndj)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 ; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
December 5, 2019 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Derek Syroka (ndj)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
December 3, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Derek Syroka (ndj)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT re #1 by plaintiff Derek Syroka (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (ndj)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
December 2, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Derek Syroka (ndj)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (ndj)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Derek Syroka; (ndj)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Derek Syroka (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Attachements, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ndj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Syroka v. Michigan, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Syroka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?