Geschwendt v. First American Title Insurance Company
Plaintiff: David Geschwendt
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01009
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding document number #17 , corrected by #22 : motion hearing is set for 2/24/2020 at 10:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER scheduling a pre-motion conference regarding document number #4 : pre-motion conference is set for 2/24/2020 at 10:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
January 10, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to remand #22 filed by First American Title Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (TerMaat, Thomas)
December 27, 2019 Filing 24 CORRECTED CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to remand #22 (corrected to comply with Local Civil Rule 10.1) filed by David Geschwendt (Zietlow, Mark) Modified text on 12/27/2019; this entry replaces #19 (ems).
December 27, 2019 Filing 23 CORRECTED BRIEF in support of MOTION to remand #22 (corrected to comply with Local Civil Rule 10.1) filed by David Geschwendt (Zietlow, Mark) Modified text on 12/27/2019; this entry replaces #18 (ems).
December 27, 2019 Filing 22 CORRECTED MOTION to remand (corrected to comply with Local Civil Rule 10.1) by plaintiff David Geschwendt; (Zietlow, Mark) Modified text on 12/27/2019; this entry replaces #17 (ems).
December 27, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE to attorney Mark H. Zietlow regarding recent filing #19 , #17 , #18 (ems)
December 27, 2019 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff David Geschwendt re Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence #19 , MOTION to remand #17 , Brief in Support of a Motion #18 (Zietlow, Mark)
December 27, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to remand #17 filed by David Geschwendt (Zietlow, Mark)
December 27, 2019 Filing 18 BRIEF in support of MOTION to remand #17 filed by David Geschwendt (Zietlow, Mark)
December 27, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to remand by plaintiff David Geschwendt; (Zietlow, Mark)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER regarding motion to remand #12 and certificate of concurrence; the motion is denied without prejudice to refile; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
December 26, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE to attorney Koral Christine Fritz regarding recent filing #13 , #12 (mg)
December 26, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff David Geschwendt re Brief in Support of a Motion #13 , MOTION to remand #12 (Fritz, Koral)
December 26, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEF in support of MOTION to remand #12 filed by David Geschwendt (Fritz, Koral)
December 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to remand by plaintiff David Geschwendt; (Fritz, Koral)
December 19, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant First American Title Insurance Company #4 ; filed by David Geschwendt filed by David Geschwendt (Zietlow, Mark)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Plaintiff's response to the pre-motion conference request #4 due no later than 12/19/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 motion for extension of time; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 #6 filed by First American Title Insurance Company (TerMaat, Thomas)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF in support of MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 #6 filed by First American Title Insurance Company (TerMaat, Thomas)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 by defendant First American Title Insurance Company; (TerMaat, Thomas)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant First American Title Insurance Company #4 filed by First American Title Insurance Company (TerMaat, Thomas)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendant First American Title Insurance Company by defendant First American Title Insurance Company; (TerMaat, Thomas)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by First American Title Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent First American Corporation, Corporate Parent First American Financial Corporation for First American Title Insurance Company (TerMaat, Thomas)
December 2, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant First American Title Insurance Company in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4666808 (TerMaat, Thomas)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee and re corporate disclosure statement (mg)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegan County Circuit Court case number 19-62056-CZ filed by First American Title Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State court summons and complaint and jury demand, court notice, court scheduling order) (TerMaat, Thomas) Modified text on 11/27/2019 (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geschwendt v. First American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Geschwendt
Represented By: Mark H. Zietlow
Represented By: Koral Christine Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas R. TerMaat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?