SL FH Produce, LLC v. Sanchez Fresh Foods, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: SL FH Produce, LLC
Defendant: Andrew Sanchez and Sanchez Fresh Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01023
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SL FH Produce, LLC (Wardrop, Thomas)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT CORRECTED Complaint for Violations of the Perishable Agricultural Commodities Act ("PACA") against Andrew Sanchez, Sanchez Fresh Foods, Inc. filed by SL FH Produce, LLC (Wardrop, Thomas)
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to attorney Thomas M. Wardrop regarding recent filing #1 (clw)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Andrew Sanchez, Sanchez Fresh Foods, Inc. (clw)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (clw)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Wardrop, Thomas)
December 5, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff SL FH Produce, LLC d/b/a Preferred Brands Produce in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4679634 (Wardrop, Thomas)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violations of the Perishable Agricultural Commodities Act ("PACA") against Andrew Sanchez, Sanchez Fresh Foods, Inc. filed by SL FH Produce, LLC d/b/a Preferred Brands Produce (Wardrop, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SL FH Produce, LLC v. Sanchez Fresh Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanchez Fresh Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SL FH Produce, LLC
Represented By: Thomas M. Wardrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?