Dyer v. Standard Management Associates LLC et al
Plaintiff: Victoria Dyer
Defendant: Bradley C. Williams, Roy J. Richards, Standard Management Associates LLC, 4CIS, Inc. and JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01064
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
February 12, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Rogers, Phillip)
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed; 4CIS, Inc. served on 1/15/2020, answer due 2/5/2020; Standard Management Associates LLC served on 1/15/2020, answer due 2/5/2020; Bradley C. Williams served on 1/15/2020, answer due 2/5/2020 (Rogers, Phillip)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER regarding preparation of joint status report: joint status report due by 2/7/2020; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC without prejudice filed by plaintiff Victoria Dyer (Rogers, Phillip)
January 13, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to complaint #1 by 4CIS, Inc., Roy J. Richards, Standard Management Associates LLC, Bradley C. Williams (O'Brien, Sean)
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants 4CIS, Inc., JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC, Roy J. Richards, Standard Management Associates LLC, Bradley C. Williams (clw)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (clw)
December 18, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Victoria Dyer in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4711867 (Rogers, Phillip)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Rogers, Phillip)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Victoria Dyer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Rogers, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dyer v. Standard Management Associates LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley C. Williams
Represented By: Sean Michael O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy J. Richards
Represented By: Sean Michael O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Management Associates LLC
Represented By: Sean Michael O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4CIS, Inc.
Represented By: Sean Michael O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JH Portfolio Debt Equities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Dyer
Represented By: Phillip C. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?