Brewer v. Capital One Financial Corporation
Plaintiff: Joshua K. Brewer
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv01067
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Joshua K. Brewer as to Capital One Financial Corporation waiver sent on 12/18/2019, answer due 2/18/2020 (Volheim, Nathan)
December 19, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Joshua K. Brewer in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4718080 (Volheim, Nathan)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (ndj)
December 18, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Eric Donald Coleman on behalf of plaintiff Joshua K. Brewer (Coleman, Eric)
December 18, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Ahmad Tayseer Sulaiman on behalf of plaintiff Joshua K. Brewer (Sulaiman, Ahmad)
December 18, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis on behalf of plaintiff Joshua K. Brewer (Hatzidimitriadis, Taxiarchis)
December 18, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Nathan Charles Volheim on behalf of plaintiff Joshua K. Brewer (Volheim, Nathan)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Capital One Financial Corporation filed by Joshua K. Brewer (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Volheim, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer v. Capital One Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua K. Brewer
Represented By: Eric Donald Coleman
Represented By: Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis
Represented By: Ahmad Tayseer Sulaiman
Represented By: Nathan Charles Volheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?