Galea v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: Shauna Galea
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01093
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from Eastern District of Michigan, of receipt of WDMI transfer case, assigning case number 2:20-cv-10259 (jlg)
January 31, 2020 CASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED to Eastern District of Michigan (pjw)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Eastern District of Michigan ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
January 29, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO #4 Order to Show Cause filed by plaintiff Shauna Galea (Vlahakis, James)
January 14, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; (Vlahakis, James)
January 14, 2020 Filing 5 (DISREGARD) SUMMONS returned executed; Midland Credit Management, Inc. served on 1/13/2020, answer due 2/3/2020 (Vlahakis, James); incorrect document attached per attorney; replaced by #6 ; Modified text on 1/14/2020 (pjw).
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff to show cause by 1/27/2020 why this matter should not be transferred to the Eastern District of Michigan ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc. (jlg)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (jlg)
December 27, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Shauna Galea in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4743850 (Vlahakis, James)
December 27, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James Constantine Vlahakis on behalf of plaintiff Shauna Galea (Vlahakis, James)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Midland Credit Management, Inc. filed by Shauna Galea (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Vlahakis, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galea v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shauna Galea
Represented By: James Constantine Vlahakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?