Trigon Steel Components, Inc. v. Steel Fab Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Trigon Steel Components, Inc.
Defendant: Steel Fab Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01095
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: absent an answer or other responsive pleading to the Complaint, Plaintiff shall, not later than 3/6/2020, move for an entry of default against Defendant or show cause in writing; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
February 4, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Matthew David Mills on behalf of defendant Steel Fab Systems, Inc. (Mills, Matthew)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Steel Fab Systems, Inc. served on 1/14/2020, answer due 2/4/2020 (Buckman, Jeffrey) Modified text on 1/17/2020 (ns).
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trigon Steel Components, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Trigon Steel Components, Inc. for Trigon Steel Components, Inc. (Buckman, Jeffrey)
December 31, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Steel Fab Systems, Inc. (ns)
December 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (ns)
December 30, 2019 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4747519; for civil filing fee (jlb)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steel Fab Systems, Inc. filed by Trigon Steel Components, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-3, #2 Summons, #3 Attachment - Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures) (Buckman, Jeffrey) Modified text on 12/31/2019 (ns).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trigon Steel Components, Inc. v. Steel Fab Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steel Fab Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew David Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trigon Steel Components, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Buckman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?