United States of America v. Hiland
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Tim Hiland
Case Number: 1:2019mc00089
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by petitioner United States of America re Voluntary Dismissal of Case #7 (Mazzocco, Nicole)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by petitioner United States of America (Mazzocco, Nicole)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by US Marshal by personal service of summons and complaint #1 and show cause #5 upon Shawn Hiland for Tim Hiland served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019 (mg) Modified text on 12/2/2019 (mg).
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting PROPOSED ORDER #4 TO SHOW CAUSE: show cause hearing set for 12/10/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Order to Show Cause by petitioner United States of America (Mazzocco (AUSA), Nicole)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (mg)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT re #1 of Sarah E. Sexton Martinez by petitioner United States of America (Mazzocco (AUSA), Nicole)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to enforce IRS summons filed by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of R.O. Matthew Spickelmier, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Letter dated September 16, 2019) (Mazzocco (AUSA), Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Hiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Nicole Mazzocco (AUSA)
Represented By: Nicole Mazzocco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tim Hiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?