Walls v. Graphic Packaging Corporation
Plaintiff: Chaz Walls
Defendant: Graphic Packaging International, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00044
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 8/28/2020; ADR to take place on or before 9/30/2020; dispositive motions due by 10/30/2020; settlement conference set for 5/26/2021 at 01:30 PM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; final pretrial conference set for 6/28/2021 at 09:00 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; jury trial set for 7/20/2021 at 08:45 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
February 24, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTES of scheduling conference by telephone held before District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Proceedings not recorded) (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
February 19, 2020 Filing 7 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Vogan, Joseph)
January 31, 2020 Copy of Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Telephone #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Connor B. Gallagher (clw)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 2/24/2020 at 04:00 PM before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; status report due by 2/19/2020; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
January 24, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Graphic Packaging Corporation (Vogan, Joseph)
January 21, 2020 Copy of Attorney Admission Letter #4 , Notice Regarding Assignment of Case #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Connor B. Gallagher (kw)
January 21, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Connor B. Gallagher; attorney admission deadline set for 2/18/2020; (kw) Modified text on 1/22/2020 (jlb).
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (kw)
January 20, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Graphic Packaging Corporation in the amount of $400, receipt number BMIWDC-4818666 (Vogan, Joseph) Modified text on 1/21/2020 (jlg)
January 20, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Stephanie R. Setterington on behalf of defendant Graphic Packaging Corporation (Setterington, Stephanie) Modified text on 1/21/2020 (jlg)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Graphic Packaging Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Graphic Packaging Holding Company for Graphic Packaging Corporation (Vogan, Joseph) Modified text on 1/21/2020 (jlg).
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kalamazoo County Circuit Court case number 2019-0407-CD filed by Graphic Packaging Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Collective Bargaining Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Grievance Materials, #3 Exhibit 3 - Arbitration Opinion, #4 Exhibit 4 - Circuit Court Pleadings) (Vogan, Joseph) Modified tex on 1/21/2020 (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walls v. Graphic Packaging Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graphic Packaging International, LLC
Represented By: Joseph J. Vogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaz Walls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?