DeYoung v. BGroup, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Derek DeYoung
Defendant: Does 1-10, Manh Quan Truong, PRINTABEL COMPANY LIMITED, BGroup, Ltd. and Thien Ha Dong
Case Number: 1:2020cv00051
Filed: January 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #92 motion for return of cash bond; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
March 3, 2020 Filing 92 MOTION for release of bond obligation by plaintiff Derek DeYoung; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Di Giacomo, John)
March 3, 2020 Filing 90 REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Register of Copyrights on the determination of a COPYRIGHT ACTION (ems)
March 3, 2020 Copy of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright #90 , Permanent Injunction #89 , Complaint #3 , Order Dismissing Case (no motion), #88 sent via U.S. Mail to Copyright Office (ems)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER of USCA (certified copy) re appeal #72 granting stipulation to dismiss appeal ; no mandate to issue (ems)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION granting stipulated proposed order #87 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting stipulated proposed order #87 ; all claims against Defendants Printabel Company Limited, Thuy Phan Thien Ha Dong, and Does 1-10 are dismissed with prejudice and without attorneys' fees; terminating this case; permanent injunction to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
March 2, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT and Stipulated Permanent Injunction (Di Giacomo, John)
February 29, 2020 Filing 86 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT and Stipulated Permanent Injunction (Di Giacomo, John)
February 28, 2020 Filing 85 RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendants Thuy Phan Thien Ha Dong, Printabel Company Limited #76 ; filed by Derek DeYoung (Di Giacomo, John) Modified text on 2/28/2020 (ems).
February 28, 2020 Filing 84 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for order to show cause as to why Defendants Should Not Be Held in Contempt, for Leave to Amend, and For Additional Expedited Discovery #83 filed by Derek DeYoung (Di Giacomo, John)
February 28, 2020 Filing 83 MOTION for order to show cause as to why Defendants Should Not Be Held in Contempt, for Leave to Amend, and For Additional Expedited Discovery by plaintiff Derek DeYoung; (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit A - Store Owners, #5 Exhibit B - Owner IPs, #6 Exhibit C - Store Staff, #7 Exhibit D - Staff IPs, #8 Exhibit E - List of Connections to Printabel, #9 Exhibit F - Test Buy, #10 Exhibit G - Account Information, #11 Exhibit H - Account Transactions, #12 Exhibit I - Newly Infringing Websites, #13 Exhibit J - Printout of Test Buy, #14 Exhibit K - Printout of larosashop.com, #15 Exhibit L - Printout of Consumer Complaints, #16 Exhibit M - Declaration of DeYoung, #17 Exhibit N - Additional Infringing Websites, #18 Exhibit O - Photo of Counterfeit Rug) (Di Giacomo, John) Modified text on 2/28/2020 (ems).
February 27, 2020 Filing 82 SURETY BOND in the amount of $50,000.00 entered by Plaintiff Derek DeYoung (ems)
February 27, 2020 Filing 81 MOTION for discovery Limited to Personal Jurisdiction by defendants Thuy Phan Thien Ha Dong, Printabel Company Limited; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Brief in Support, #2 Attachment Certificate of Word Compliance, #3 Attachment Certificate of Concurrence, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Exhibit A - Discovery to Plaintiff, #6 Exhibit B - Ltr to Schaefer, #7 Exhibit C - Unpublished Case) (Schaefer, C.)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER regarding motion for discovery #78 and certificate of concurrence; the motion is denied without prejudice to refile; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL granting stipulated proposed order #77 ; Defendants BGroup, Ltd. and Manh Quan Truong, only, are dismissed with prejudice and without attorneys' fees; modifying order re: motion for preliminary injunction; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
February 26, 2020 Filing 78 MOTION for discovery Limited to Personal Jurisdiction by defendants Thuy Phan Thien Ha Dong, Printabel Company Limited; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Brief in Support, #2 Attachment Certificate of Compliance, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit A - Discovery to Plaintiff, #5 Exhibit B - Ltr to Schaefer, #6 Exhibit C - Unpublished Case) (Schaefer, C.)
February 25, 2020 Filing 77 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Dismiss Defendants BGroup Limited and and Truong with Prejudice by plaintiff Derek DeYoung (Di Giacomo, John)
February 21, 2020 Filing 76 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendants Thuy Phan Thien Ha Dong, Printabel Company Limited (Schaefer, C.)
February 21, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE regarding Limited Appearance by defendant Thuy Phan Thien Ha Dong (Schaefer, C.) Modified text on 2/21/2020 (ems).
February 20, 2020 CASE NUMBER 20-1151 assigned by the Sixth Circuit to appeal #72 (mkc)
February 20, 2020 Filing 74 APPEAL TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held 02/14/2020 before Honorable Janet Neff; re appeal #72 ; NOTE: this transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the release of transcript restriction date; after that date it may be obtained through PACER; under the #Policy Regarding Transcripts the parties have 14 days within which to file a Notice of Intent to redact, and 21 days within which to file a Redaction Request; if no Transcript Redaction Request is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and this transcript will be made available via PACER after the release of transcript restriction set for 5/20/2020 ; redaction request due 3/12/2020 (Court Reporter-Transcriptionist: Brandell, Paul (517) 230-7507)
February 20, 2020 Filing 73 LETTER FROM CCA regarding appeal #72 indicating appeal has been docketed as USCA case number 20-1151 (ems)
February 20, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL re #67 by defendant Printabel Company Limited (Schaefer, C.)
February 20, 2020 APPEAL FEE PAID re #72 by defendant Printabel Company Limited in the amount of $505, receipt number AMIWDC-4934525 (Schaefer, C.)
February 19, 2020 Filing 71 TRANSCRIPT of Excerpt of Preliminary Injunction Hearing - Judge's Opinion held 02/14/2020 before Honorable Janet Neff; NOTE: this transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the release of transcript restriction date; after that date it may be obtained through PACER; under the #Policy Regarding Transcripts the parties have 14 days within which to file a Notice of Intent to redact, and 21 days within which to file a Redaction Request; if no Transcript Redaction Request is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and this transcript will be made available via PACER after the release of transcript restriction set for 5/19/2020 ; redaction request due 3/11/2020 (Court Reporter-Transcriptionist: Brandell, Paul (517) 230-7507)
February 18, 2020 Filing 70 RESPONSE TO REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendants BGroup, Ltd., Manh Quan Truong #44 ; filed by Derek DeYoung (Osorio, Amanda) Modified text on 2/19/2020 (ems).
February 17, 2020 Filing 69 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Printabel Company Limited (Schaefer, C.)
February 14, 2020 Filing 68 MINUTES of hearing on motion for preliminary injunction #21 held before Judge Janet T. Neff (Court Reporter: Paul Brandell) (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER re: motion for preliminary injunction #21 ; temporary restraining order #7 as extended #31 is DISSOLVED; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting to an extent #61 motion to seal; leave is GRANTED under RESTRICTED ACCESS; The Clerk of Court is directed to restrict the access of the ShopBase Defendants' Exhibit 13 to Exhibit 1 of their Surreply (ECF No. 64), with access limited to the Court, and counsel of record for Plaintiff and Defendants only; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #57 motion for leave to file surreply #60 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
February 14, 2020 Filing 64 (RESTRICTED ACCESS) EXHIBIT 13 to Surreply by defendants BGroup, Ltd., Manh Quan Truong re Surreply to Motion, #60 [Access to this document is available to the Court and attorney(s) for Mahn Quan Truong, Printabel Company Limited, Thuy Phan Thien Ha Dong, Derek DeYoung, BGroup, Ltd., and Unknown Parties only] (Broxup, Daniel) Modified text and access per Order #66 on 2/18/2020 (ems).
February 14, 2020 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to SEAL #61 filed by BGroup, Ltd., Manh Quan Truong (Broxup, Daniel)
February 14, 2020 Filing 62 BRIEF in support of MOTION to SEAL #61 filed by BGroup, Ltd., Manh Quan Truong (Broxup, Daniel)
February 14, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION to SEAL by defendants BGroup, Ltd., Manh Quan Truong; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order Granting Motion) (Broxup, Daniel)
February 14, 2020 Filing 60 SURREPLY TO MOTION by plaintiff Derek DeYoung #2 , MOTION for preliminary injunction #21 filed by BGroup, Ltd., Manh Quan Truong (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Truong Manh Quan with Exhibits Thereto) (Broxup, Daniel) Modified text on 2/18/2020 (ems).
February 14, 2020 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file Surreply #57 filed by BGroup, Ltd., Manh Quan Truong (Broxup, Daniel)
February 14, 2020 Filing 58 BRIEF in support of MOTION for leave to file Surreply #57 filed by BGroup, Ltd., Manh Quan Truong (Broxup, Daniel)
February 14, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION for leave to file Surreply by defendants BGroup, Ltd., Manh Quan Truong; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order Granting Motion) (Broxup, Daniel)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #53 motion to exceed word count limit; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER dismissing as moot #51 motion for leave to file reply; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
February 13, 2020 Filing 54 REPLY to response to motion #21 for preliminary injunction filed by Derek DeYoung (Attachments: #1 Exhibit III - December 2019 PayPal Transactions, #2 Exhibit JJJ - Declaration of Samantha Troiani, #3 Exhibit KKK - Supplemental Declaration of McGregor, #4 Exhibit LLL - Declaration of Bihrle, #5 Exhibit MMM - NOCI to ShopBase, #6 Exhibit NNN - Declaration of Di Giacomo, #7 Exhibit OOO - Printout of Shopbase Website, #8 Exhibit PPP - Printout of Print Hub Information, #9 Exhibit QQQ - Printout of Chavelary.com, #10 Exhibit RRRR - Printout of Menaap.com, #11 Exhibit SSS - Printout of Oddcrate.com, #12 Exhibit TTT - Printout of Tuluhu.com, #13 Exhibit UUU - Declaration of DeYoung, #14 Exhibit VVV - Declaration of Whitney, #15 Exhibit WWW - Declaration of Walsworth, #16 Exhibit XXX - Declaration of Winter, #17 Exhibit YYY - Infringement of Other Brands, #18 Exhibit ZZZ - Selling Passports, #19 Exhibit AAAA - Truong ID, #20 Exhibit BBBB - Amelia Quilts Scam, #21 Exhibit CCCC - Sleepynfancy Scam, #22 Exhibit DDDD - Other Brayden Rogers Sites, #23 Exhibit EEEE - Cached Websites, #24 Exhibit FFFF - Stripe Production, #25 Exhibit GGGG - Declaration of Osorio, #26 Exhibit HHHH - Stripe Payouts, #27 Exhibit IIII - Email from Payoneer, #28 Exhibit JJJJ - Connection to Bank Accounts, #29 Exhibit KKKK - Fammade Printout, #30 Exhibit LLLL - Sharkspree Printout, #31 Exhibit MMMM - PayPal Chargeback Report, #32 Exhibit NNNN - Average Chargeback Rates, #33 Exhibit OOOO - PayPal Wrongly Denied Dispute, #34 Exhibit PPPP - IP Address Blocks, #35 Exhibit QQQQ - ShopBase Payment) (Di Giacomo, John) Modified text on 2/14/2020 (ems).
February 13, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION for leave to file excess pages by plaintiff Derek DeYoung; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Di Giacomo, John)
February 13, 2020 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for leave to file consolidated reply to Defendants' opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction #51 filed by Derek DeYoung (Di Giacomo, John)
February 13, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION for leave to file consolidated reply to Defendants' opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by plaintiff Derek DeYoung; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Di Giacomo, John)
February 13, 2020 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BGroup, Ltd. (Puplava, Jennifer)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #45 motion to extend time; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER dismissing as moot #37 motion to enlarge page limits; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
February 11, 2020 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #23 #45 filed by BGroup, Ltd., Manh Quan Truong (Broxup, Daniel)
February 11, 2020 Filing 46 BRIEF in support of MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #23 #45 filed by BGroup, Ltd., Manh Quan Truong (Broxup, Daniel)
February 11, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #23 by defendants BGroup, Ltd., Manh Quan Truong; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order Granting Motion) (Broxup, Daniel)
February 11, 2020 Filing 44 REQUEST for pre-motion conference by defendants BGroup, Ltd., Manh Quan Truong (Broxup, Daniel)
February 10, 2020 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response in Opposition #42 filed by Printabel Company Limited (Schaefer, C.) Modified text on 2/11/2020 (ems).
February 10, 2020 Filing 42 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for preliminary injunction #21 filed by Printabel Company Limited (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Emails, #3 Exhibit 3 - Unreported Case) (Schaefer, C.)
February 10, 2020 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response in Opposition #40 filed by BGroup, Ltd., Manh Quan Truong (Puplava, Jennifer) Modified text on 2/11/2020 (ems).
February 10, 2020 Filing 40 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for preliminary injunction #21 filed by BGroup, Ltd., Manh Quan Truong (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Truong Manh Quan with Exhibits Thereto) (Puplava, Jennifer)
February 10, 2020 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re UNOPPOSED MOTION for leave to file excess pages (Motion to Enlarge Page Limit for Response to Preliminary Injunction) #37 filed by BGroup, Ltd., Manh Quan Truong (Puplava, Jennifer) Modified text on 2/11/2020 (ems).
February 10, 2020 Filing 38 BRIEF in support of UNOPPOSED MOTION for leave to file excess pages (Motion to Enlarge Page Limit for Response to Preliminary Injunction) #37 filed by BGroup, Ltd., Manh Quan Truong (Puplava, Jennifer) Modified text on 2/11/2020 (ems).
February 10, 2020 Filing 37 UNOPPOSED MOTION for leave to file excess pages (Motion to Enlarge Page Limit for Response to Preliminary Injunction) by defendants BGroup, Ltd., Manh Quan Truong; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order Granting Motion) (Puplava, Jennifer) Modified text on 2/11/2020 (ems).
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER striking #33 motion to dismiss; the Court will allow counsel to file a brief responding to motion #21 and to appear at the 2/14/2020 hearing; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
February 10, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of C. Enrico Schaefer on behalf of defendant Printabel Company Limited (Schaefer, C.)
February 7, 2020 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion #34 filed by BGroup, Ltd., Manh Quan Truong (Broxup, Daniel)
February 7, 2020 Filing 34 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #33 filed by BGroup, Ltd., Manh Quan Truong (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit) (Broxup, Daniel)
February 7, 2020 Filing 33 (STRICKEN) MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction by defendants BGroup, Ltd., Manh Quan Truong; (Broxup, Daniel) Modified text per Order #36 on 2/10/2020 (ems).
February 7, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE regarding Limited Appearance by defendants BGroup, Ltd., Manh Quan Truong (Broxup, Daniel)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER extending temporary injunctive relief; Defendants' response re #21 due not later than February 10, 2020; Show Cause hearing set for February 14, 2020 at 10:00 am, before Judge Janet T. Neff, 401 Ford Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI; Clerk's Office to UNSEAL the documents previously sealed in this case; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
February 3, 2020 Filing 30 MINUTES of hearing held before Judge Janet T. Neff (Court Reporter: Paul Brandell) (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
February 3, 2020 Filing 29 SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT re #21 (Exhibit HHH) by plaintiff Derek DeYoung (Di Giacomo, John) Modified text on 2/3/2020 (ems).
February 3, 2020 Filing 28 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Motion for Preliminary Injunction by plaintiff Derek DeYoung (Di Giacomo, John)
February 2, 2020 Filing 27 SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT re #21 (Exhibit GGG) by plaintiff Derek DeYoung (Di Giacomo, John) Modified text on 2/3/2020 (ems).
February 2, 2020 Filing 26 SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT re #21 (Exhibit FFF) by plaintiff Derek DeYoung (Di Giacomo, John) Modified text on 2/3/2020 (ems).
February 2, 2020 Filing 25 SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT re #21 (Exhibit EEE) by plaintiff Derek DeYoung (Di Giacomo, John) Modified text on 2/3/2020 (ems).
January 30, 2020 Filing 24 BOND in the amount of $10,000.00 tendered by attorney Eric Misterovich on behalf of plaintiff pursuant to Order #7 (ems)
January 30, 2020 RECEIPT: in the amount of $10,000.00, receipt number KZ004057, tendered by attorney Eric Misterovich on behalf of plaintiff pursuant to Order #7 (ems)
January 30, 2020 Filing 23 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Derek DeYoung (Di Giacomo, John)
January 30, 2020 Filing 22 CORRECTED EXHIBIT re #21 (Exhibit LL) by plaintiff Derek DeYoung (Di Giacomo, John) Modified text on 1/30/2020 (ems).
January 29, 2020 SUMMONS returned executed; BGroup, Ltd. served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/18/2020; Printabel Company Limited served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/18/2020 (as taken from #19 and #20 ) (ems) Modified text on 2/3/2020 (ems).
January 29, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for preliminary injunction by plaintiff Derek DeYoung; (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit HH, #4 Exhibit II, #5 Exhibit JJ, #6 Exhibit KK, #7 Exhibit LL, #8 Exhibit MM, #9 Exhibit NN, #10 Exhibit OO, #11 Exhibit PP, #12 Exhibit QQ, #13 Exhibit RR, #14 Exhibit SS, #15 Exhibit TT, #16 Exhibit UU, #17 Exhibit VV, #18 Exhibit WW, #19 Exhibit XX, #20 Exhibit YY, #21 Exhibit ZZ, #22 Exhibit AAA, #23 Exhibit BBB, #24 Exhibit CCC, #25 Exhibit DDD) (Di Giacomo, John) Modified text on 1/30/2020 (ems).
January 29, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for defendant BGroup, Ltd. by plaintiff Derek DeYoung re Summons Not Issued ; filed under seal pursuant to order 5 (Di Giacomo, John) Modified text and access per Order #31 on 2/3/2020 (ems).
January 29, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for defendant Printabel Company Limited by plaintiff Derek DeYoung re Summons Not Issued ; filed under seal pursuant to order 5 (Di Giacomo, John) Modified text and access per Order #31 on 2/3/2020 (ems).
January 29, 2020 Filing 18 PROPOSED SUMMONS by plaintiff Derek DeYoung re Summons Not Issued ; filed under seal pursuant to order 5 (Di Giacomo, John) Modified text and access per Order #31 on 2/3/2020 (ems).
January 27, 2020 SUMMONS returned executed; Thuy Phan Thien Ha Dong served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/18/2020; Manh Quan Truong served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/18/2020 (as taken from #17 ) (ems) Modified text on 2/3/2020 (ems).
January 27, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for defendants Manh Quan Truong and Thuy Phan Thien Ha Dong by plaintiff Derek DeYoung re Summons Not Issued ; filed under seal pursuant to order 5 (Di Giacomo, John) Modified text and access per Order #31 on 2/3/2020 (ems).
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re SEALED MOTION by plaintiff Derek DeYoung ; filed under seal pursuant to order 5 #15 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) Modified text and access per Order #31 on 2/3/2020 (ems).
January 24, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION by plaintiff Derek DeYoung ; filed under seal pursuant to order 5 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Di Giacomo, John) Modified text and access per Order #31 on 2/3/2020 (ems).
January 23, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants BGroup, Ltd., Manh Quan Truong, Printabel Company Limited, and Thuy Phan Thien Ha Dong (ems) Modified text and access per Order #31 on 2/3/2020 (ems).
January 22, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED SUMMONS by plaintiff Derek DeYoung re Summons Not Issued ; filed under seal pursuant to order 5 (Di Giacomo, John) Modified text and access per Order #31 on 2/3/2020 (ems).
January 22, 2020 Filing 12 PROPOSED SUMMONS by plaintiff Derek DeYoung re Summons Not Issued ; filed under seal pursuant to order 5 (Di Giacomo, John) Modified text and access per Order #31 on 2/3/2020 (ems).
January 22, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED SUMMONS by plaintiff Derek DeYoung re Summons Not Issued ; filed under seal pursuant to order 5 (Di Giacomo, John) Modified text and access per Order #31 on 2/3/2020 (ems).
January 22, 2020 Filing 10 PROPOSED SUMMONS by plaintiff Derek DeYoung re Summons Not Issued ; filed under seal pursuant to order 5 (Di Giacomo, John) Modified text and access per Order #31 on 2/3/2020 (ems).
January 22, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Register of Copyrights on the filing of a COPYRIGHT ACTION (ems)
January 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (ems)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #2 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb) Modified text and access per Order #31 on 2/3/2020 (ems).
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re EX PARTE MOTION by plaintiff Derek DeYoung #4 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb) Modified text and access per Order #31 on 2/3/2020 (ems).
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #1 signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb) Modified text and access per Order #31 on 2/3/2020 (ems).
January 22, 2020 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00, receipt number KZ004050; for civil filing fee (ems)
January 22, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Amanda Marie-Anderson Osorio on behalf of plaintiff Derek DeYoung (Osorio, Amanda)
January 22, 2020 Copy of Sealed Complaint #3 , Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Copyright Office (ems)
January 22, 2020 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants BGroup, Ltd., Thuy Phan Thien Ha Dong, Printabel Company Limited, Manh Quan Truong (none provided and filing fee not paid) (ems)
January 20, 2020 COMPLAINT (as taken from previously Sealed Document #3 ) against BGroup, Ltd., Thuy Phan Thien Ha Dong, Printabel Company Limited, Manh Quan Truong, Unknown Parties filed by Derek DeYoung (ems)
January 20, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION by plaintiff Derek DeYoung (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Di Giacomo, John) Modified text and access per Order #5 on 1/22/2020 (ems). Modified text and access per Order #31 on 2/3/2020 (ems).
January 20, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed against All Defendants by plaintiff Derek DeYoung (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Di Giacomo, John) Modified text and access per Order #5 on 1/22/2020 (ems). Modified text and access per Order #31 on 2/3/2020 (ems).
January 20, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION by plaintiff Derek DeYoung (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Derek DeYoung, #4 Exhibit B - Printout of Website, #5 Exhibit C - Printout of Website, #6 Exhibit D - Copyright Registration Certificate, #7 Exhibit E - Printabel Information, #8 Exhibit F - Dong Information, #9 Exhibit G - Printabel About Page, #10 Exhibit H - WHOIS Record, #11 Exhibit I - Printout of Printabel.net, #12 Exhibit J - Printout of Scenic Market Ad, #13 Exhibit K - Printout of Home and About Pages from CozyNFancy, AZCozy, and HMCozy, #14 Exhibit L - Consumer Complaints, #15 Exhibit M - Printout of Checkout Pages, #16 Exhibit N - Printout of BBB Page, #17 Exhibit O - BGroup Ltd. Information, #18 Exhibit P - Truong Information, #19 Exhibit Q - Shopify Statement, #20 Exhibit R - ShopBase Homepage, #21 Exhibit S - List of Products, #22 Exhibit T - Payment Plans, #23 Exhibit U - ShopBase Website Payments Explanation, #24 Exhibit V - Printout of Loi Vuong Facebook Page, #25 Exhibit W - Printout of Crunchbase, #26 Exhibit X - VVN, LLC Better Business Bureau Page, #27 Exhibit Y - Printout of Platfox Website, #28 Exhibit Z - Payaz.net Printout, #29 Exhibit AA - Declaration of Di Giacomo, #30 Exhibit BB - PayPal NOCI, #31 Exhibit CC - Amazon NOCI, #32 Exhibit DD - Amazon NOCI, #33 Exhibit EE - Response from Printabel, #34 Exhibit FF - List of Infringing Links, #35 Exhibit GG - Printout of Correspondence Evidencing Actual Confusion) (Di Giacomo, John) Modified text and access per Order #5 on 1/22/2020 (ems). Modified text and access per Order #31 on 2/3/2020 (ems).
January 20, 2020 Filing 1 EX PARTE MOTION to File Under Seal by plaintiff Derek DeYoung (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Di Giacomo, John)
January 20, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John Anthony Di Giacomo on behalf of plaintiff Derek DeYoung (Di Giacomo, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeYoung v. BGroup, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manh Quan Truong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRINTABEL COMPANY LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BGroup, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thien Ha Dong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek DeYoung
Represented By: John Anthony Di Giacomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?