Reid v. Allied Revenue Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Jerome Reid
Defendant: Allied Revenue Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00081
Filed: January 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting proposed stipulated order #8 ; Starr, Butler, Alexopoulos & Stoner, PLLC is substituted in the place and stead of Varnum Riddering Schmidt & Howlett LLP as counsel for Defendant; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
March 25, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Scott D. Stoner on behalf of defendant Allied Revenue Services, LLC (Stoner, Scott)
March 24, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Substitution of Counsel by defendant Allied Revenue Services, LLC (Schramm, Thomas)
March 24, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Thomas A. Schramm on behalf of defendant Allied Revenue Services, LLC (Schramm, Thomas)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting STIPULATION to extend time #6 ; Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading due no later than 4/6/2020; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
March 4, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by defendant Allied Revenue Services, LLC (Koelzer, Jeffrey)
March 2, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Steven T. Buquicchio on behalf of defendant Allied Revenue Services, LLC (Buquicchio, Steven)
March 2, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jeffrey David Koelzer on behalf of defendant Allied Revenue Services, LLC (Koelzer, Jeffrey)
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to attorney James Lee Davidson regarding recent filing #4 (ems)
February 14, 2020 SUMMONS returned executed; Allied Revenue Services, LLC served on 2/13/2020, answer due 3/5/2020 (as taken from #4 ) (ems) Modified text on 2/18/2020 (ems).
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jerome Reid for Summons and Class Action Complaint (Davidson, James)
February 12, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Andrew Lloyd Campbell on behalf of plaintiff Jerome Reid (Campbell, Andrew)
February 4, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James Lee Davidson on behalf of plaintiff Jerome Reid (Davidson, James)
January 30, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Allied Revenue Services, LLC (ems)
January 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ems)
January 30, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Jerome Reid in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4859159 (Greenwald, Michael)
January 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Allied Revenue Services, LLC filed by Jerome Reid (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - October 28, 2019 Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Greenwald, Michael) Modified text on 1/30/2020 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reid v. Allied Revenue Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Revenue Services, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey David Koelzer
Represented By: Steven T. Buquicchio
Represented By: Thomas A. Schramm
Represented By: Scott D. Stoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Reid
Represented By: Michael Lewis Greenwald
Represented By: Andrew Lloyd Campbell
Represented By: James Lee Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?