Scalia v. West Shore Medical Personnel Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia
Defendant: West Shore Medical Personnel Services, Inc. and Janet Hunter
Case Number: 1:2020cv00101
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 motion for extension of time; Defendants' answer or responsive pleading due 5/11/2020; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
March 25, 2020 Filing 8 CORRECTED MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 by defendants Janet Hunter, West Shore Medical Personnel Services, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Attachment) (Michals, Spiros)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER regarding motion for extension of time #6 and certificate of concurrence; the motion is denied without prejudice to refile; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
March 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 by defendants Janet Hunter, West Shore Medical Personnel Services, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Michals, Spiros) Modified text on 3/24/2020 (ems).
March 10, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Spiros T. Michals on behalf of defendants Janet Hunter, West Shore Medical Personnel Services, Inc. (Michals, Spiros)
March 6, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Eugene Scalia as to Janet Hunter waiver sent on 2/11/2020, answer due 4/13/2020 (Rothfeder, Lindsey) Modified text on 3/6/2020 (ems).
March 6, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Eugene Scalia as to West Shore Medical Personnel Services, Inc. waiver sent on 2/11/2020, answer due 4/13/2020 (Rothfeder, Lindsey) Modified text on 3/6/2020 (ems).
February 7, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Ryan D. Cobb on behalf of plaintiff Eugene Scalia (Cobb, Ryan)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Janet Hunter, West Shore Medical Personnel Services, Inc. (ems)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ems)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Eugene Scalia (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Rothfeder, Lindsey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scalia v. West Shore Medical Personnel Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Shore Medical Personnel Services, Inc.
Represented By: Spiros T. Michals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Hunter
Represented By: Spiros T. Michals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia
Represented By: Lindsey Rothfeder
Represented By: Ryan D. Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?