Graf v. Resorts International, N.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Mark Graf
Defendant: Resorts International, N.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00106
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Copy of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright #10 , Voluntary Dismissal of Case #9 , complaint, #1 sent via U.S. Mail to Copyright Office (ems)
April 3, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Register of Copyrights on the determination of a COPYRIGHT ACTION (ems)
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by plaintiff Mark Graf (Rothman, Joel)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER requiring dismissal papers to be filed no later than 4/13/2020; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
March 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (Rothman, Joel)
March 12, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Brian M. Andrew on behalf of defendant Resorts International, N.A., Inc. (Andrew, Brian)
March 2, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; Resorts International, N.A., Inc. served on 2/21/2020, answer due 3/13/2020 (Rothman, Joel)
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions by plaintiff Mark Graf (Rothman, Joel) Modified text on 2/28/2020 (ems).
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Resorts International, N.A., Inc. (ems)
February 6, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Mark Graf in the amount of $400, receipt number BMIWDC-4883896 (Rothman, Joel)
February 6, 2020 Copy of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright #3 , complaint, #1 sent via U.S. Mail to Copyright Office (ems)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Register of Copyrights on the filing of a COPYRIGHT ACTION (ems)
February 6, 2020 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Resorts International, N.A., Inc. (filing fee not paid) (ems)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (ems)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand for copyright infringement (Injunctive Relief Demanded) against Resorts International, N.A., Inc. filed by Mark Graf (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2- Infringement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Demand Letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 AO Form 121) (Rothman, Joel) Modified text on 2/6/2020 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graf v. Resorts International, N.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Graf
Represented By: Joel B. Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resorts International, N.A., Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?