Shubert et al v. Mor-Dall Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: TERRENCE FRITH and SETH SHUBERT
Defendant: KRISTINE MORSE, Mor-Dall Enterprises, Inc., DARK HORSE HEALTH PLAN, CALLY MORSE and AARON MORSE
Case Number: 1:2020cv00152
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Terrence Frith, Seth Shubert re APPLICATION for entry of default as to All Defs. Mor-Dall Enters., Inc., Aaron Morse, Kristine Morse, Cally Morse, and Dark Horse Health Plan #11 (Sahu, Saura)
March 27, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION for entry of default as to All Defs. Mor-Dall Enters., Inc., Aaron Morse, Kristine Morse, Cally Morse, and Dark Horse Health Plan (Sahu, Saura)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
March 18, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed; Cally Morse served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020 (Sahu, Saura)
March 18, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed; Kristine Morse served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020 (Sahu, Saura)
March 16, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed; Dark Horse Health Plan served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020 (Sahu, Saura)
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; Mor-Dall Enterprises, Inc. served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020 (Sahu, Saura)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Aaron Morse served on 2/26/2020, answer due 3/18/2020 (Sahu, Saura)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Dark Horse Health Plan, Mor-Dall Enterprises, Inc., Aaron Morse, Cally Morse, Kristine Morse (mg)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (mg)
February 20, 2020 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00 by Attorney Saura James Sahu on behalf of plaintiffs, receipt number GR069848; for filing fee (mkc)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Sahu, Saura)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Terrence Frith, Seth Shubert (Sahu, Saura) Modified text on 2/20/2020 (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shubert et al v. Mor-Dall Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRISTINE MORSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mor-Dall Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARK HORSE HEALTH PLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALLY MORSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AARON MORSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRENCE FRITH
Represented By: Saura James Sahu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SETH SHUBERT
Represented By: Saura James Sahu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?