Vandermaas v. Law Office of Richard Kessler, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Marisol Vandermaas
Defendant: Law Office of Richard Kessler, P.C., Lucy Kessler and Richard Kessler
Case Number: 1:2020cv00169
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Lucy Kessler, Richard Kessler, Law Office of Richard Kessler, P.C. (Greene, Anthony)
March 4, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lucy Kessler, Richard Kessler, Law Office of Richard Kessler, P.C. and delivered to US Marshal for service (mg)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (mg)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Alvarez, Robert)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Alvarez, Robert)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Marisol Vandermaas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Alvarez, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vandermaas v. Law Office of Richard Kessler, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisol Vandermaas
Represented By: Robert Anthony Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office of Richard Kessler, P.C.
Represented By: Anthony C. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucy Kessler
Represented By: Anthony C. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Kessler
Represented By: Anthony C. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?