Merrill et al v. Transworld Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brittany Wilk, Allison L Merrill and Allison L. Merrill
Defendant: Transworld Systems, Inc. and U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 1:2020cv00183
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (AMENDED) by U.S. Bank National Association identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for U.S. Bank National Association (Clopton, Andrew)
April 16, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Albert J. Rota on behalf of defendant U.S. Bank National Association (Rota, Albert)
April 9, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Justin Harriss Homes on behalf of defendant Transworld Systems, Inc. (Homes, Justin)
April 1, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by U.S. Bank National Association identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association (Clopton, Andrew)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER; deadline to file motions to dismiss is 5/15/2020; responses due by 6/29/2020; replies due by 7/29/2020; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Deadlines by defendant U.S. Bank National Association (Clopton, Andrew)
March 31, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Andrew J. Clopton on behalf of defendant U.S. Bank National Association (Clopton, Andrew)
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Transworld Systems, Inc. served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/07/2020 (Myers, Daniel) Modified text on 3/31/2020 (slk).
March 24, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Deborah A. Lujan on behalf of defendant Transworld Systems, Inc. (Lujan, Deborah)
March 11, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Heidi Marie Hodek on behalf of plaintiff Brittany Wilk (Hodek, Heidi)
March 11, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Heidi Marie Hodek on behalf of plaintiff Allison L. Merrill (Hodek, Heidi)
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Transworld Systems, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association (mg)
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Myers, Daniel)
March 9, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Matthew Hanley on behalf of plaintiff Brittany Wilk (Hanley, Matthew)
March 9, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Matthew Hanley on behalf of plaintiff Allison L. Merrill (Hanley, Matthew)
March 3, 2020 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Transworld Systems, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association (none provided) (mg)
March 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (mg)
March 2, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Allison L. Merrill, Brittany Wilk in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4971619 (Myers, Daniel) Modified text on 3/3/2020 (jlg)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Allison L. Merrill, Brittany Wilk (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Myers, Daniel) Modified text on 3/3/2020 (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merrill et al v. Transworld Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transworld Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Deborah A. Lujan
Represented By: Justin Harriss Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Andrew J. Clopton
Represented By: Albert J. Rota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Wilk
Represented By: Daniel O. Myers
Represented By: Heidi Marie Hodek
Represented By: Matthew Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison L Merrill
Represented By: Daniel O. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison L. Merrill
Represented By: Daniel O. Myers
Represented By: Heidi Marie Hodek
Represented By: Matthew Hanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?