Valdez v. El Milagro of Michigan, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ricardo Valdez
Defendant: El Milagro of Michigan, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00198
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 motion for settlement; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
April 16, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT MOTION for settlement by plaintiff Ricardo Valdez; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Alvarez, Robert)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 5/6/2020 at 04:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 4/29/2020 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
March 18, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Allan S. Rubin on behalf of defendant El Milagro of Michigan, Inc. (Rubin, Allan)
March 18, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Daniel Curran Waslawski on behalf of defendant El Milagro of Michigan, Inc. (Waslawski, Daniel)
March 18, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ricardo Valdez as to El Milagro of Michigan, Inc. waiver sent on 3/13/2020, answer due 5/12/2020 (Alvarez, Robert)
March 10, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant El Milagro of Michigan, Inc. (plaintiff's attorney to serve per #4 ) (clw) Modified text on 3/10/2020 (clw).
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (clw)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE Regarding IFP by plaintiff Ricardo Valdez (Alvarez, Robert)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Alvarez, Robert)
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Alvarez, Robert)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against El Milagro of Michigan, Inc. filed by Ricardo Valdez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Alvarez, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valdez v. El Milagro of Michigan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Valdez
Represented By: Robert Anthony Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Milagro of Michigan, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Curran Waslawski
Represented By: Allan S. Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?