Schooley v. Clemens Food Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Schooley and Breahanna Schooley
Defendant: Clemens Food Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00225
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 1/29/2021; ADR deadline 2/28/2021; dispositive motions due by 3/31/2021; settlement conference set for 10/14/2021 at 01:30 PM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; final pretrial conference set for 11/15/2021 at 09:00 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; jury trial set for 12/6/2021 at 08:45 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) Modified text on 5/1/2020 per Chambers (ns).
April 27, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTES of scheduling conference by telephone held before District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Proceedings not recorded) (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Camps, Peter)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 4/27/2020 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; status report due by 4/22/2020; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Clemens Food Group, LLC (Ciucci, Joseph)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Financial Interest by Clemens Food Group, LLC (Ciucci, Joseph)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (ns)
March 13, 2020 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Clemens Food Group, LLC in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-5016946 (Ciucci, Joseph)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Branch County Circuit Court case number 20-02-084-CD filed by Clemens Food Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Ciucci, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schooley v. Clemens Food Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breahanna Schooley
Represented By: Peter N. Camps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clemens Food Group, LLC
Represented By: Joseph A. Ciucci
Represented By: Christopher D. Kanne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?