Barnaby v. Mayfield et al
Plaintiff: Owen W. Barnaby
Defendant: Mabel J. Mayfield, James Robert Redford, Joel P. Hoekstra, William B. Murphy, David H. Sawyer, Michigan Court of Appeals, Berrien County Trial Court, John M. Donahue, Jane M. Beckering, Mark T. Boonstra, John E. Dewane, Alfred M. Butzbaugh and Dennis M. Wiley
Case Number: 1:2020cv00232
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
2 Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Certified Copies of Order Regarding Report and Recommendation #23 , Judgment #24 sent via U.S. Mail to Owen W. Barnaby (ems)
May 7, 2020 Filing 24 JUDGMENT; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPINION AND ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #8 ; Plaintiff's objection motion #9 and motion for clarification #13 are DENIED; Plaintiff's request for the Clerk of the Court to enter default judgment #19 is DENIED; Defendants Michigan Court of Appeals, Murphy, Beckering, Hoekstra, Sawyer, Boonstra, and Redford's Motion to Dismiss #15 is DENIED as moot; Defendants Berrien County Circuit Trial Court Judges, Mayfield, Wiley, Butzbaugh, Dewane and Donahue's Objection #21 is DENIED as moot; Judgment to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
April 29, 2020 Filing 22 PROOF OF MAILING by defendants Berrien County Trial Court, Alfred M. Butzbaugh, John E. Dewane, John M. Donahue, Mabel J. Mayfield, Dennis M. Wiley re MOTION to dismiss #21 (Holmstrom, Jeffrey)
April 29, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to dismiss by defendants Berrien County Trial Court, Alfred M. Butzbaugh, John E. Dewane, John M. Donahue, Mabel J. Mayfield, Dennis M. Wiley; (Holmstrom, Jeffrey)
April 27, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Owen W. Barnaby re MOTION for default judgment as to all defendants #19 (mg)
April 27, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for default judgment as to all defendants by plaintiff Owen W. Barnaby; (mg)
April 21, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for MOTION to dismiss for Improper Service #15 filed by Jane M. Beckering, Mark T. Boonstra, Joel P. Hoekstra, Michigan Court of Appeals, William B. Murphy, James Robert Redford, David H. Sawyer (Asbenson, Kendell)
April 21, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss for Improper Service #15 filed by Jane M. Beckering, Mark T. Boonstra, Joel P. Hoekstra, Michigan Court of Appeals, William B. Murphy, James Robert Redford, David H. Sawyer (Asbenson, Kendell)
April 21, 2020 Filing 16 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for Improper Service #15 filed by Jane M. Beckering, Mark T. Boonstra, Joel P. Hoekstra, Michigan Court of Appeals, William B. Murphy, James Robert Redford, David H. Sawyer (Asbenson, Kendell)
April 21, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to dismiss for Improper Service by defendants Jane M. Beckering, Mark T. Boonstra, Joel P. Hoekstra, Michigan Court of Appeals, William B. Murphy, James Robert Redford, David H. Sawyer; (Asbenson, Kendell)
April 15, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Owen W. Barnaby re Amended Complaint, #12 , MOTION to clarify re #4 #13 (mg)
April 15, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to clarify re #4 by plaintiff Owen W. Barnaby; (mg)
April 15, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jane M. Beckering, Berrien County Trial Court, Mark T. Boonstra, Alfred M. Butzbaugh, John E. Dewane, John M. Donahue, Joel P. Hoekstra, Mabel J. Mayfield, Michigan Court of Appeals, William B. Murphy, James Robert Redford, David H. Sawyer, Dennis M. Wiley filed by Owen W. Barnaby (mg)
April 9, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Owen W. Barnaby re Objection to Report and Recommendation #10 , OBJECTION re #7 by plaintiff Owen W. Barnaby #9 (mg)
April 9, 2020 Filing 10 OBJECTION by plaintiff Owen W. Barnaby to Report and Recommendation #8 (mg)
April 9, 2020 Filing 9 OBJECTION re #7 by plaintiff Owen W. Barnaby (mg)
March 26, 2020 Copy of Report and Recommendation #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Owen Barnaby (tlbu)
March 25, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 ; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
March 23, 2020 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Owen W. Barnaby (jlb)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
March 19, 2020 Copy of Notice Regarding Reassignment of Case #6 , Order of Recusal #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Owen W. Barnaby (mg)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Judge Janet T. Neff for all further proceedings pursuant to Order 5 by Judge Paul L. Maloney ; Judge Paul L. Maloney no longer assigned to case (mg)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL: District Judge Paul L. Maloney recused from this case; case to be reassigned; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
March 19, 2020 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Owen W. Barnaby (mg)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
March 18, 2020 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Owen W. Barnaby (jlb)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (jlb)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (jlb)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Owen W. Barnaby (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Summons) (jlb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnaby v. Mayfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mabel J. Mayfield
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Holmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Robert Redford
Represented By: Kendell Scott Asbenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel P. Hoekstra
Represented By: Kendell Scott Asbenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William B. Murphy
Represented By: Kendell Scott Asbenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H. Sawyer
Represented By: Kendell Scott Asbenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Court of Appeals
Represented By: Kendell Scott Asbenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berrien County Trial Court
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Holmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Donahue
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Holmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane M. Beckering
Represented By: Kendell Scott Asbenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark T. Boonstra
Represented By: Kendell Scott Asbenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Dewane
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Holmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred M. Butzbaugh
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Holmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis M. Wiley
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Holmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owen W. Barnaby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?