Titus et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cindy Lou Titus and Alan Eugene Titus
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C.R. Bard, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00267
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Copy of Case Management Order #26 sent via U.S. Mail to Arati C. Furness and Matthew Ryan McCarley (ndj)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FIRST CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Second Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 6/17/2021 at 3:00 PM before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
May 20, 2020 Filing 25 MINUTES of scheduling conference held by video before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; case management order to issue (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (sjc)
May 13, 2020 Copy of Notice Rescheduling Hearing #24 sent via U.S. Mail to Matthew Ryan McCarley and Arati C. Furness (ndj)
May 11, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE rescheduling hearing that was previously set for 5/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in person; Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 5/20/2020 at 10:30 AM at by video before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; (fhw)
May 11, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Alyson L. Oliver on behalf of plaintiffs Alan Eugene Titus, Cindy Lou Titus (Oliver, Alyson)
May 11, 2020 Filing 23 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER - SECOND NOTICE sent to attorney Matthew Ryan McCarley; attorney admission deadline set for 6/8/2020; (jlb)
May 11, 2020 Filing 22 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER - SECOND NOTICE sent to attorney Arati C. Furness; attorney admission deadline set for 6/8/2020; (jlb)
May 11, 2020 Copy of Order #19 sent via U.S. Mail to Arati C Furness per #21 (jlb)
May 8, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Steve Schulte on behalf of plaintiffs Alan Eugene Titus, Cindy Lou Titus (Schulte, Steve)
May 8, 2020 Filing 20 JOINT STATUS REPORT submitted for filing by defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. JOINT STATUS REPORT AMENDED TO CORRECT CERTIFICATION LANGUAGE (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A Stipulative Protective Order (MDL Doc. 269), #3 Exhibit B Non-Waiver Order (MDL Doc. 314), #4 Exhibit C CMO No. 7 (MDL Doc. 401), #5 Exhibit D Amended CMO No. 17 (MDL Doc. 4015), #6 Exhibit E CMO No. 9 ESI Protocol (MDL Doc. 1259), #7 Exhibit F CMO No. 12 Joint Record Collection (MDL Doc. 1663)) (Ghosh, Sanjay)
May 7, 2020 Copy of Order #19 sent via U.S. Mail to Matthew McCarley and Arati Furness (clw)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
May 4, 2020 Filing 18 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A Stipulative Protective Order (MDL Doc. 269), #3 Exhibit B Non-Waiver Order (MDL Doc. 314), #4 Exhibit C CMO No. 7 (MDL Doc. 401), #5 Exhibit D Amended CMO No. 17 (MDL Doc. 4015), #6 Exhibit E CMO No. 9 ESI Protocol (MDL Doc. 1259), #7 Exhibit F CMO No. 12 Joint Record Collection (MDL Doc. 1663)) (Ghosh, Sanjay)
May 4, 2020 Copy of Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, #16 sent via U.S. Mail to Arati Furness (ndj)
May 1, 2020 Filing 21 RETURNED MAIL: Copy of Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, #16 , Administrative Order Reassigning Case #12 that was sent via U.S. Mail to Arati C Furness returned to the Court marked forwarding time expired ;mailed to Fears Nachawati PLLC 5473 Blair Rd, Suite 100, Dallas, TX 75231 (Attachments: #1 returned mail) (ndj) Modified text on 5/11/2020 (ndj). Modified date filed on 5/12/2020. (kw)
April 30, 2020 CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Arati C Furness to 5473 Blair Rd Suite 100, Dallas Tx 75231 (ndj)
April 30, 2020 Filing 17 RETURNED MAIL: Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case #8 that was sent via U.S. Mail to Arati Furness returned to the Court marked mail forward time expired ;remailed to address (ndj)
April 22, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John G. Mitchell on behalf of defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Mitchell, John)
April 22, 2020 Copy of Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, #16 sent via U.S. Mail to Matthew McCarley and Arati Furness (ndj)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 5/20/2020 at 10:00 AM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; status report due by 5/15/2020; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
April 20, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interest by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson & Company, Corporate Parent C. R. Bard, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
April 20, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interest by C.R. Bard, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson & Company for C.R. Bard, Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
April 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Richard B. North, Jr., Esq. by defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay) Modified text on 4/22/2020 (ndj).
April 17, 2020 Copy of Administrative Order Reassigning Case #12 sent via U.S. Mail to attorneys Arati C. Furness, Matthew Ryan McCarley, and Richard B North, Jr (ems)
April 16, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Taylor Tapley Daly on behalf of defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Daly, Taylor)
April 16, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Sanjay Ghosh on behalf of defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
April 15, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Amanda Barield Fopma on behalf of defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Fopma, Amanda)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER No. 20-CA-031 that this case is reassigned to Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker and Magistrate Judge Ray Kent for all further proceedings; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (ems)
April 10, 2020 Copy of Attorney Admission Letter #9 , Attorney Admission Letter #11 , Attorney Admission Letter #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Arati C Furness, Matthew Ryan McCarley, Richard B North, Jr (mlc)
April 10, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Richard B North; attorney admission deadline set for 5/8/2020; (mlc)
April 10, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Matthew R McCarley; attorney admission deadline set for 5/8/2020; (mlc)
April 10, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Arati C Furness; attorney admission deadline set for 5/8/2020; (mlc)
April 10, 2020 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Arati C Furness, Matthew Ryan McCarley, Richard B North, Jr (mlc) Modified text on 4/10/2020 (mlc).
April 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ndj)
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Kent indicating that this case is not related to 1:19-cv-741, 1:19-cv-887, 1:19-cv-888, 1:19-cv-889, 1:19-cv-890, 1:20-cv-267, 1:20-cv-268, 1:20-cv-269, 1:20-cv-274, 1:20-cv-275,1:20-cv-276, 1:20-cv-278, 1:20-cv-279, 1:20-cv-280, but cognate pursuant to W.D. Mich. LCivR 3.3.2(c)(i) (ndj) Modified text on 4/15/2020 (ndj).
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Arizona, their case number 2:18-cv-02161; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (ndj)
March 26, 2020 Remark - Case transferred to the Western District of Michigan via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-2161-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15708103 filed by Cindy Lou Titus, Alan Eugene Titus. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Titus et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Lou Titus
Represented By: Arati C Furness
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Steve Schulte
Represented By: Arati C. Furness
Represented By: Alyson L. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Eugene Titus
Represented By: Arati C Furness
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Represented By: Steve Schulte
Represented By: Arati C. Furness
Represented By: Alyson L. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Sanjay Ghosh
Represented By: Amanda Barield Fopma
Represented By: John G. Mitchell
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Sanjay Ghosh
Represented By: Amanda Barield Fopma
Represented By: John G. Mitchell
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?