Flynn v. C.R. Bard, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dale Flynn
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C.R. Bard, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00279
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER - SECOND NOTICE sent to attorney Randi Alyson Kassan; attorney admission deadline set for 6/8/2020; (jlb)
April 29, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of case filed by defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
April 22, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John G. Mitchell on behalf of defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Mitchell, John)
April 22, 2020 Copy of Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, #16 sent via U.S. Mail to Randi Alyson Kassan (mg)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 5/20/2020 at 10:00 AM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; status report due by 5/15/2020; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
April 20, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interest by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson & Company, Corporate Parent C. R. Bard, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
April 20, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interest by C.R. Bard, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson & Company for C.R. Bard, Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
April 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Richard B. North, Jr., Esq. by defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
April 17, 2020 Copy of Administrative Order Reassigning Case #12 sent via U.S. Mail to attorneys Randi Alyson Kassan and Richard B North, Jr (ems)
April 16, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Taylor Tapley Daly on behalf of defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Daly, Taylor)
April 16, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Sanjay Ghosh on behalf of defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
April 15, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Amanda Barield Fopma on behalf of defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Fopma, Amanda)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER No. 20-CA-031 that this case is reassigned to Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker and Magistrate Judge Ray Kent for all further proceedings; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (ems)
April 10, 2020 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case #9 sent via U.S. Mail to attorneys Randi Alyson Kassan and Richard B North, Jr (ems)
April 10, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Richard B. North; attorney admission deadline set for 5/8/2020; (mg)
April 10, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Randi A. Kassan; attorney admission deadline set for 5/8/2020; (mg)
April 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (mg)
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Kent indicating that this case not related to 1:19-cv-741, 1:19-cv-887, 1:19-cv-888, 1:19-cv-889, 1:19-cv-890, 1:20-cv-267, 1:20-cv-268, 1:20-cv-269, 1:20-cv-274, 1:20-cv-275,1:20-cv-276, 1:20-cv-278, 1:20-cv-279, 1:20-cv-, but cognate pursuant to W.D. Mich. LCivR 3.3.2(c)(i) (ndj)
March 27, 2020 Filing 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Arizona, their case number 2:19-cv-00200; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (ndj)
March 26, 2020 Remark - Case transferred to the Western District of Michigan via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B] (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details.Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-200-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Dale Flynn. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16400302 filed by Dale Flynn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flynn v. C.R. Bard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: Sanjay Ghosh
Represented By: John G. Mitchell
Represented By: Amanda Barield Fopma
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Sanjay Ghosh
Represented By: John G. Mitchell
Represented By: Amanda Barield Fopma
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Flynn
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?