Aumiller et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Janene L Aumiller, Lyndol Aumiller and Janene L. Aumiller
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C.R. Bard, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00366
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 52 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER - SECOND NOTICE sent to attorney Troy Alexander Brenes; attorney admission deadline set for 6/29/2020; (jlb)
May 19, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of David A. Priehs on behalf of plaintiff Janene L. Aumiller (Priehs, David)
May 15, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE rescheduling hearing that was previously set for 5/20/2020 at 10:30 AM by video conference; Rule 16 scheduling conference is rescheduled to 7/27/2020 at 11:00 AM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; joint status report due 7/22/2020 (fhw)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 motion to stay Rule 16 Scheduling conference; Rule 16 scheduling conference to be rescheduled by separate order; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
May 15, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING JOINT MOTION to stay the case #49 to Magistrate Judge Ray Kent under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
May 15, 2020 Copy of Order on Motion to Stay #50 , Notice Rescheduling Hearing, #51 sent via U.S. Mail to attorney Troy Alexander Brenes (ems)
May 14, 2020 Filing 49 JOINT MOTION to stay the case by defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order to Stay the Case) (Ghosh, Sanjay) Modified text on 5/15/2020 (ems).
May 13, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Richard B. North, Jr. by defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
May 13, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Matthew B. Lerner by defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
May 13, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Mark T. Clouatre by defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
May 13, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Dennis A. Hom by defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
May 13, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Blake A. Gansborg by defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
May 13, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Christopher Shaun Polston by defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
May 13, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John G. Mitchell on behalf of defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Mitchell, John)
May 12, 2020 Copy of Notice Rescheduling Hearing #42 sent via U.S. Mail to attorneys Blake A. Gansborg, Christopher Shaun Polston, Dennis A. Hom, Mark Thomas Clouatre, Matthew Brian Lerner, Richard B. North, Jr, and Troy Alexander Brenes (ems)
May 11, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE rescheduling hearing that was previously set for 5/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in person; Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 5/20/2020 at 10:30 AM at by video before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; (fhw)
May 8, 2020 Filing 41 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson & Company, Corporate Parent C. R. Bard, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
May 8, 2020 Filing 40 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C.R. Bard, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson & Company for C.R. Bard, Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
May 8, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Amanda Barield Fopma on behalf of defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Fopma, Amanda)
May 8, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Sanjay Ghosh on behalf of defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Ghosh, Sanjay)
May 8, 2020 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Taylor Tapley Daly on behalf of defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Daly, Taylor)
May 6, 2020 Copy of Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, #38 , Order #39 sent via U.S. Mail to Blake A. Gansborg, Christopher Shaun Polston, Dennis A. Hom, Mark Thomas Clouatre, Matthew Brian Lerner, Richard B. North, Jr, and Troy Alexander Brenes (mg)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 5/20/2020 at 10:00 AM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; status report due by 5/15/2020; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
May 4, 2020 Copy of Administrative Order Reassigning Case #37 sent via U.S. Mail to Blake A. Gansborg, Christopher Shaun Polston, Dennis A. Hom, Mark Thomas Clouatre, Matthew Brian Lerner, Richard B. North, Jr, and Troy Alexander Brenes (jlb)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER No. 20-CA-038 that this case is reassigned to Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker for all further proceedings ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (clw)
May 1, 2020 Filing 36 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Richard B. North, Jr.; attorney admission deadline set for 5/29/2020; (ems)
May 1, 2020 Filing 35 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Matthew Brian Lerner; attorney admission deadline set for 5/29/2020; (ems)
May 1, 2020 Filing 34 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Mark Thomas Clouatre; attorney admission deadline set for 5/29/2020; (ems)
May 1, 2020 Filing 33 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Dennis A. Hom; attorney admission deadline set for 5/29/2020; (ems)
May 1, 2020 Filing 32 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Christopher Shaun Polston; attorney admission deadline set for 5/29/2020; (ems)
May 1, 2020 Filing 31 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Blake A. Gansborg; attorney admission deadline set for 5/29/2020; (ems)
May 1, 2020 Filing 30 ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER sent to attorney Troy Alexander Brenes; attorney admission deadline set for 5/29/2020; (ems)
May 1, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ems)
May 1, 2020 Filing 28 (DISREGARD) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (ems) Modified text on 5/1/2020 (ems).
May 1, 2020 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case #29 sent via U.S. Mail to attorneys Troy Alexander Brenes, Blake A. Gansborg, Christopher Shaun Polston, Dennis A. Hom, Mark Thomas Clouatre, Matthew Brian Lerner, and Richard B. North, Jr. (ems)
April 30, 2020 Filing 27 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Ray Kent indicating that this case is not related but cognate to 1:19-cv-741 (jlg)
April 29, 2020 Filing 26 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Colorado, their case number 1:20-cv-00833; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (jlg)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting #24 Joint Motion to Transfer. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction [Doc. #19 ] is DENIED AS MOOT. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), this civil action shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Michigan. By Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 04/23/2020. (athom, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/29/2020.]
April 23, 2020 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Gansborg, Blake) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/29/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #21 Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4/20/2020.(tsher, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/29/2020.]
April 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #21 Motion to Stay re #19 First Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 4/18/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/29/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Stay re #19 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Gansborg, Blake) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/29/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4/13/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (tsher, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/29/2020.]
April 6, 2020 Filing 19 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Gansborg, Blake) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/29/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Blake A. Gansborg on behalf of All Defendants (Gansborg, Blake) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/29/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Dennis A. Hom on behalf of All Defendants (Hom, Dennis) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/29/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher Shaun Polston on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Polston, Christopher) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/29/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard B. North, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (North, Richard) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/29/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew Brian Lerner on behalf of All Defendants (Lerner, Matthew) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/29/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Blake A. Gansborg on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Blake A. Gansborg added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Blake A. Gansborg added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft) (Gansborg, Blake) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/29/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark Thomas Clouatre on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Mark Thomas Clouatre added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Thomas Clouatre added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft) (Clouatre, Mark) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/29/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 3/27/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/29/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (trvo, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/29/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 9 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (trvo, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/29/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 8 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 4/29/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:17-cv-02932. File, transfer order and docket sheet received [Transferred from Colorado on 4/29/2020.]
March 26, 2020 REMARK: Case Transferred to the District of Colorado via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/26/2020.] [Transferred from Colorado on 4/29/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B](MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/26/2020.] [Transferred from Colorado on 4/29/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/26/2020.] [Transferred from Colorado on 4/29/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. (Third) See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/26/2020.] [Transferred from Colorado on 4/29/2020.]
August 30, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Janene L Aumiller, Lyndol Aumiller. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/26/2020.] [Transferred from Colorado on 4/29/2020.]
August 30, 2017 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-02932-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/26/2020.] [Transferred from Colorado on 4/29/2020.]
August 30, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14598558 filed by Lyndol Aumiller, Janene L Aumiller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/26/2020.] [Transferred from Colorado on 4/29/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aumiller et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janene L Aumiller
Represented By: Troy Alexander Brenes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyndol Aumiller
Represented By: Troy Alexander Brenes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janene L. Aumiller
Represented By: Troy Alexander Brenes
Represented By: David A. Priehs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis A. Hom
Represented By: Christopher Shaun Polston
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Blake A. Gansborg
Represented By: Mark Thomas Clouatre
Represented By: Matthew Brian Lerner
Represented By: Sanjay Ghosh
Represented By: John G. Mitchell
Represented By: Amanda Barield Fopma
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis A. Hom
Represented By: Christopher Shaun Polston
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Blake A. Gansborg
Represented By: Mark Thomas Clouatre
Represented By: Matthew Brian Lerner
Represented By: Sanjay Ghosh
Represented By: John G. Mitchell
Represented By: Amanda Barield Fopma
Represented By: Taylor Tapley Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?